This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 03/11/2022 at 06:04:26 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. RICHE SHEMEKA

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RICHE SHEMEKA. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DONALD G JACOBSEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DONALD G JACOBSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RICHE SHEMEKA

Davenport, FL 33837

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARTMAN KATHERINE SARAH

Attorney at ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY

Assistant State Attorney, P O Box 9000 Drawer Sa

Bartow, FL 33831

Defendant Attorneys

DIMMIG HOWARD L II

Public Defender, Po Box 9000, Drawer Pd

Bartow, FL 33831-9000

VALENCIA VANESSA

P O Box 9000 Drawer Pd

Bartow, FL 33881-9000

THOMPSON JALEN

P O Box 9000 Drawer Public Defender

Bartow, FL 33830-9000

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

11/10/2021: AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

BOOKING SHEET

11/10/2021: BOOKING SHEET

FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 11/10/21

11/10/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 11/10/21

BOOKING SHEET

11/15/2021: BOOKING SHEET

BOND -DBB

11/15/2021: BOND -DBB

BOND -DBB

11/15/2021: BOND -DBB

BOND -DBB

11/15/2021: BOND -DBB

NOTICE TO APPEAR

11/15/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR

DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

11/15/2021: DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

COURT NOTIFICATION

11/18/2021: COURT NOTIFICATION

AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

11/30/2021: AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

BOND DISCHARGED/MAILED

12/01/2021: BOND DISCHARGED/MAILED

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 12/14/21

12/21/2021: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 12/14/21

NOTICE OF FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE

01/13/2022: NOTICE OF FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE

COURT NOTIFICATION

02/11/2022: COURT NOTIFICATION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 03/24/2022; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: PRET - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Section: F3; Judge: DONALD G JACOBSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketAPD of Record, THOMPSON JALEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketReason: PRET--PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BY DEBODOOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 3/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 12/14/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 12/14/2021; Court Time: 8:15 AM; Location: BARTOW 5 B RED ELEVATOR; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: A2; Judge: EMERGENCY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketASA of Record, ARTMAN KATHERINE SARAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED/MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOKING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSTORR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 12/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketReason: FAHR--FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING BY JESSTORR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 11/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: FALSE INFO TO LEO/MISSING PERSON/FELON; Statute: 837.055.1; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : DAPD210000844; Agency : DAVENPORT POLICE DEPARTMENT; Arrest Date : 11/09/2021; OBTS : 5308007374; Offense Date : 11/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: DISORDERLY CONDUCT OR BREACH OF PEACE; Statute: 877.03; Level: M; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : DAPD210000844; Agency : DAVENPORT POLICE DEPARTMENT; Arrest Date : 11/09/2021; OBTS : 5308007374; Offense Date : 11/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: RESIST/OBSTR OFFICER W/OUT VIOLENCE; Statute: 843.02; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : DAPD210000844; Agency : DAVENPORT POLICE DEPARTMENT; Arrest Date : 11/09/2021; OBTS : 5308007374; Offense Date : 11/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: TAMPER/FABRICATE W PHYSICAL EVIDENCE; Statute: 918.13; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : DAPD210000844; Agency : DAVENPORT POLICE DEPARTMENT; Arrest Date : 11/09/2021; OBTS : 5308007374; Offense Date : 11/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARTMAN KATHERINE SARAH