This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 03/19/2023 at 20:44:07 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. PLETERSKI AIDEN ALOJZ

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PLETERSKI AIDEN ALOJZ. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LORI A WINSTEAD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LORI A WINSTEAD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PLETERSKI AIDEN ALOJZ

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

06/10/2021: AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

BOOKING SHEET

06/10/2021: BOOKING SHEET

ORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

06/11/2021: ORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 6-10-21

06/10/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 6-10-21

NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL , WPNG, WA, REQ JT, COPIES, NOT INTENT PART DIS (PA LIWINSON

06/10/2021: NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL , WPNG, WA, REQ JT, COPIES, NOT INTENT PART DIS (PA LIWINSON

NO BILL BY STATE ATTORNEY

06/22/2021: NO BILL BY STATE ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

09/08/2021

DocketSPECIAL ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT TO SECTION F7 DATED 07/16/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSESTR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

DocketDELETE HEARING FOR THE DATE: 7/14/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2021

DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE BATTERY TOUCH OR STRIKE; Statute: 784.03.1A1; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: NO BILL/DROPPED/ABANDONED; Disposition/Action Date: 06/22/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2021

DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FALSE IMPRISONMENT; Statute: 787.02.1A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: NO BILL/DROPPED/ABANDONED; Disposition/Action Date: 06/22/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNO BILL BY STATE ATTORNEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2021

HearingCourt Date: 06/10/2021; Court Time: 1:00 PM; Location: FIRST APPEARANCE VIRTUAL; Motion: FAHR - FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING; Section: M6; Judge: KEVIN M KOHL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL , WPNG, WA, REQ JT, COPIES, NOT INTENT PART DIS (PA LIWINSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2021

DocketRe: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY MAYABROW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
06/10/2021

DocketDELETE HEARING FOR THE DATE: 7/14/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 6-10-21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketBOOKING SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2021

DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSESTR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2021

DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 7/14/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2021

DocketReason: FAHR--FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING BY JESSESTR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2021

DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 6/10/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2021

DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE BATTERY TOUCH OR STRIKE; Statute: 784.03.1A1; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210024042; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 06/09/2021; OBTS : 5308001358; Offense Date : 06/09/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2021

DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FALSE IMPRISONMENT; Statute: 787.02.1A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210024042; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 06/09/2021; OBTS : 5308001358; Offense Date : 06/09/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less