This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 10/29/2021 at 16:04:20 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. OATES RICHARD JEROME

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against OATES RICHARD JEROME. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DONALD G JACOBSEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DONALD G JACOBSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

OATES RICHARD JEROME

Winter Haven, FL 33880

OATES STRETCH

OATS RICHARD

OATES RICHARD

OATES RICHARD J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DIMMIG HOWARD L II

Public Defender, Po Box 9000, Drawer Pd

Bartow, FL 33831-9000

PEARL MICHELA

Attorney at PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

Public Defender'S Office, P O Box 9000 Drawer Pd

Bartow, FL 33830

 

Court Documents

DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

10/19/2021: DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

10/15/2021: AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 10/15/21

10/15/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 10/15/21

BOOKING SHEET

10/15/2021: BOOKING SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 11/16/2021; Court Time: 1:00 PM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: A2; Judge: EMERGENCY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAPD of Record, PEARL MICHELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 10/15/2021; Court Time: 1:00 PM; Location: BARTOW 8 E BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: FAHR - FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING; Section: M6; Judge: STACIE LEA KAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 10/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOKING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSTORR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 11/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketReason: FAHR--FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING BY JESSTORR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 10/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: POSSESS OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Statute: 893.13.6A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042893; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; OBTS : 5308006555; Offense Date : 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: USE OR POSSESS DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Statute: 893.147.1; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042893; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; OBTS : 5308006555; Offense Date : 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEARL MICHELA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIMMIG HOWARD L II