This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/19/2021 at 16:33:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. NEGRON MORRIS ADAN

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against NEGRON MORRIS ADAN. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT G FEGERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00BA

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT G FEGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

NEGRON MORRIS ADAN

Lakeland, FL 33805

NEGRON-MORRES ADAN NEGRON

MORIS NEGRON

NEGRON MORRIS ADEN

MORRIS ADAN NEGRON

NEGRON ADAN BEBO

MORRIS ADAN

NEGRON ADAN MORRIS

NEGRON-MORRIS ADAN

MORRIS ADAN N

MORRIS NEGRON ADAN

BEBO ADAN NEGRON

MORRIS ADAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIFFENKRANZ DAKOTA MARK

Attorney at ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY

Assistant State Attorney, Polk County Courthouse

Bartow, FL 33831

Defendant Attorney

REID RENEE

Assistant Public Defender, P O Box 9000 Drawer Pd

Bartow, FL 33831-9000

 

Court Documents

MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 1/28/21

01/29/2021: MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 1/28/21

MOTION TO BE RELEASED ON ROR - SENT TO M9 FOR REVIEW

12/04/2020: MOTION TO BE RELEASED ON ROR - SENT TO M9 FOR REVIEW

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

10/30/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 10/29/20

10/29/2020: MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 10/29/20

MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 9/24/20

09/25/2020: MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 9/24/20

FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER

09/14/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER

BOOK-IN SHEET

09/14/2020: BOOK-IN SHEET

PENDING COLLECTION REVIEW

09/09/2020: PENDING COLLECTION REVIEW

FINGERPRINT RECORDED

07/28/2020: FINGERPRINT RECORDED

MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 7/22/20

07/24/2020: MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 7/22/20

JUDGMENT/SENTENCE RECORDED-THIS IS NOT A LIEN 7/24/2020

07/24/2020: JUDGMENT/SENTENCE RECORDED-THIS IS NOT A LIEN 7/24/2020

BOND DISCHARGED LETTER MAILED

07/13/2020: BOND DISCHARGED LETTER MAILED

FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER

07/13/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER

BOOK-IN SHEET

07/13/2020: BOOK-IN SHEET

NOTICE OF INTENT INSPECT/COPY/TEST/PHOTO INFORM AND MATERIAL

07/01/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT INSPECT/COPY/TEST/PHOTO INFORM AND MATERIAL

DISCOVERY EXHIBIT DEMAND FOR RECIPRICOL DISCOVERY

06/30/2020: DISCOVERY EXHIBIT DEMAND FOR RECIPRICOL DISCOVERY

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

06/24/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

BOND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/24/2020: BOND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 03/18/2021; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: HREV - PROBATION REVOCATION HEARING; Section: M9; Judge: ROBERT G FEGERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketReason: HREV--PROBATION REVOCATION HEARING BY LATOJOIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 3/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialEffective Date: 01/29/2021; Due Date: 08/24/2020; Fee Desc: collection agency LB 00911; Fee Amount: 199.20; Total Amount Due: 199.20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 1/28/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/28/2021; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: MISDMEANOR VOP VIRTUAL; Motion: HREV - PROBATION REVOCATION HEARING; Section: M9; Judge: ROBERT G FEGERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO BE RELEASED ON ROR - SENT TO M9 FOR REVIEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketReason: HREV--PROBATION REVOCATION HEARING BY AMYSANZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 1/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY HONGNGUY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 6/22/2020 / NCCF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Pros Phase; Description: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE BATTERY; Statute: 784.03.1A1; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Reduced; Disposition/Action: FILED; Disposition/Action Date: 06/16/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE SUMMONS REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF INVESTIGATION COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILE TRANSFERRED FROM 20CF-004565-XX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial Phase; Description: FELONY BATTERY (2ND OR SUBSQ OFF); Statute: 784.03.2; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO200022935; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 06/09/2020; Name at Arrest : MORRIS ADAN; OBTS : 5301201773; Offense Date : 06/08/2020; Rearrest Booking Num : 2030118; Rearrest Date : 09/12/2020; Rearrest OBTS : 5301203023; Rearrest NCIC : 5012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIFFENKRANZ DAKOTA MARK