This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/02/2023 at 04:27:44 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MARTINEZ CARMELO

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MARTINEZ CARMELO. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN L BARBER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN L BARBER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MARTINEZ CARMELO

Winter Haven, FL 33880

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIFFENKRANZ DAKOTA MARK

Attorney at ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY

Assistant State Attorney, Polk County Courthouse

Bartow, FL 33831

Defendant Attorney

COLEMAN JAYDE REON

Attorney at PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE

Public Defenders Office, P O Box 9000-Pd

Bartow, FL 33881-9000

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

12/29/2022: AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

BOOKING SHEET

12/29/2022: BOOKING SHEET

FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER

12/29/2022: FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER

DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

12/30/2022: DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

BOOKING SHEET

01/04/2023: BOOKING SHEET

BOND -ASSBB

01/04/2023: BOND -ASSBB

BOND -ASSBB

01/04/2023: BOND -ASSBB

DEF SIGNED NOTICE/APPEAR ON DEMAND AT JAIL

01/04/2023: DEF SIGNED NOTICE/APPEAR ON DEMAND AT JAIL

COURT NOTIFICATION

01/09/2023: COURT NOTIFICATION

AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

01/17/2023: AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

01/17/2023: AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY EMAILED CHRISTINE/LAUREN

01/31/2023: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY EMAILED CHRISTINE/LAUREN

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/31/2023; Court Time: 8:15 AM; Location: BARTOW 9 C BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: A2; Judge: EMERGENCY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY EMAILED CHRISTINE/LAUREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketASA of Record, GRIFFENKRANZ DAKOTA MARK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: ATTEMPT TAMPER/FABRICATE W PHYSICAL EVIDENCE; Statute: 918.13.1B; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: FILED; Disposition/Action Date: 01/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: POSSESS OF COCAINE; Statute: 893.13.6A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: FILED; Disposition/Action Date: 01/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED -DUPLICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOKING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • DocketAPD of Record, COLEMAN JAYDE REON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSESTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 1/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOKING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: ATTEMPT TAMPER/FABRICATE W PHYSICAL EVIDENCE; Statute: 918.13.1B; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO220054043; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 12/27/2022; OBTS : 5309015534; Offense Date : 12/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: POSSESS OF COCAINE; Statute: 893.13.6A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO220054043; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 12/27/2022; OBTS : 5309015534; Offense Date : 12/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less