This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 10/29/2021 at 16:05:21 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MALAVE RICHARD

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MALAVE RICHARD. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEITH SPOTO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEITH SPOTO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MALAVE RICHARD

Valrico, FL 33594

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DIMMIG HOWARD L II

Public Defender, Po Box 9000, Drawer Pd

Bartow, FL 33831-9000

PEREZ LEANDRO

P O Box 9000 Drawer Pd

Bartow, FL 33831-9000

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTIFICATION

10/27/2021: COURT NOTIFICATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR

10/26/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR

BOND -REED

10/26/2021: BOND -REED

BOND -REED

10/26/2021: BOND -REED

BOOKING SHEET

10/26/2021: BOOKING SHEET

APPLICANT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

10/22/2021: APPLICANT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

10/18/2021: DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

10/15/2021: AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 10/15/21

10/15/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 10/15/21

BOOKING SHEET

10/15/2021: BOOKING SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 11/16/2021; Court Time: 8:15 AM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: A2; Judge: EMERGENCY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • BondBond Number: PC201485976; Bond Date: 10/26/2021; Bond Amount: 1,000.00; Bond Type: Surety; Bond Status: ACTIVE; Bond Agent: REED Issue Date : 10/22/2021; Filed Date : 10/26/2021; Surety Co. Info: Surety Agent code : CNTM; Name : CONTINENTAL HERITAGE INSURANCE CO; Address 1 :200 PARK AVE SUITE 400; City : ORANGE VILLAGE; State: OH; Zip : 44122; Phone: 440-995-1409; Agent Info: Bond Agent code : REED; Name : RICO REED BAIL BONDS; Address 1 :240 N BROADWAY AVE; City : BARTOW; State: FL; Zip : 33830; Phone: 863-534-8989

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • BondBond Number: PC201485977; Bond Date: 10/26/2021; Bond Amount: 500.00; Bond Type: Surety; Bond Status: ACTIVE; Bond Agent: REED Issue Date : 10/22/2021; Filed Date : 10/26/2021; Surety Co. Info: Surety Agent code : CNTM; Name : CONTINENTAL HERITAGE INSURANCE CO; Address 1 :200 PARK AVE SUITE 400; City : ORANGE VILLAGE; State: OH; Zip : 44122; Phone: 440-995-1409; Agent Info: Bond Agent code : REED; Name : RICO REED BAIL BONDS; Address 1 :240 N BROADWAY AVE; City : BARTOW; State: FL; Zip : 33830; Phone: 863-534-8989

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketRe: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY TONISELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 11/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketRe: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY TONISELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDELETE HEARING FOR THE DATE: 11/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND -REED

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketRe: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSESTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDELETE HEARING FOR THE DATE: 11/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSESTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 11/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSESTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 11/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketReason: FAHR--FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING BY JESSESTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 10/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: POSSESS OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Statute: 893.13.6A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042770; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; OBTS : 5309001540; Offense Date : 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: USE OR POSSESS DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Statute: 893.147.1; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042770; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; OBTS : 5309001540; Offense Date : 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEREZ LEANDRO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIMMIG HOWARD L II