This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 03/02/2022 at 16:08:10 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. LUIHN VANTEDGE PARTNERS LLC

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LUIHN VANTEDGE PARTNERS LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE DALY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00BA

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE DALY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

LUIHN VANTEDGE PARTNERS LLC

2950 Gateway Center Blvd

Morrisville, NC 27560

 

Court Documents

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FILED / CHECK STUBS

02/17/2022: LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FILED / CHECK STUBS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial Phase; Description: POLK CO ALARM CONTROL ORD/PCSO - CLASS IV; Statute: 97-36P4; Level: I; Degree: N; Status: Notice to Appear; Disposition/Action Date: 02/17/2022; Agency Report Num : PCSOS220271016; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; NTA Issue Date : 01/27/2022; Offense Date : 01/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 9039438; Receipt Date: 02/17/2022; Receipt Amount: 158.00; Paying Customer: LUIHN VANTEDGE PARTNERS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FILED / CHECK STUBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • FinancialEffective Date: 02/16/2022; Due Date: 03/18/2022; Fee Desc: Co Security Alarm Viol Cl IV; Fee Amount: 158.00; Total Amount Due: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCIVIL PENALTY/ORDINANCE FILED - HOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LUIHN VANTEDGE PARTNERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant