This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 01/27/2023 at 11:34:30 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. LONKER FRANCES

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LONKER FRANCES. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JALAL A HARB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JALAL A HARB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

LONKER FRANCES R

Valrico, FL 33594-4381

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HILGENFELDT CONNOR W

P O Box 9000 Drawer Sao, Polk County Courthouse

Bartow, FL 33830

Defendant Attorney

OTTO WALTER A

P O Box 9000 Drawer Rc-2

Bartow, FL 33831-9000

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTIFICATION

01/25/2023: COURT NOTIFICATION

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 01/17/2023

01/18/2023: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 01/17/2023

COURT NOTIFICATION

01/04/2023: COURT NOTIFICATION

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 01/03/23

01/03/2023: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 01/03/23

INFORMATION FILED

12/16/2022: INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (RC OTTO)

12/16/2022: NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (RC OTTO)

DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

12/16/2022: DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

COURT NOTIFICATION

12/12/2022: COURT NOTIFICATION

ORDER WITHDRAWING AND APPOINTING COUNSEL (RC)

12/06/2022: ORDER WITHDRAWING AND APPOINTING COUNSEL (RC)

DEF SIGNED NOTICE/APPEAR ON DEMAND AT JAIL

12/05/2022: DEF SIGNED NOTICE/APPEAR ON DEMAND AT JAIL

BOND -KWEA

12/05/2022: BOND -KWEA

BOND -KWEA

12/05/2022: BOND -KWEA

BOND -KWEA

12/05/2022: BOND -KWEA

BOOKING SHEET

12/05/2022: BOOKING SHEET

FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 12/1/22

12/01/2022: FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 12/1/22

AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

12/01/2022: AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

MOTION TO W/DRAW-CONFLICT OF INTEREST

12/02/2022: MOTION TO W/DRAW-CONFLICT OF INTEREST

BOOKING SHEET

12/01/2022: BOOKING SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 04/04/2023; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: PRET - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Section: F4; Judge: JALAL A HARB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketReason: PRET--PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BY KAITFREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 4/4/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 01/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/17/2023; Court Time: 1:00 PM; Location: BARTOW MAIN COURTROOM; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: A2; Judge: EMERGENCY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/03/2023; Court Time: 8:15 AM; Location: BARTOW MAIN COURTROOM; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: A2; Judge: EMERGENCY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 01/03/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketRe: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY HANNWILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 12/1/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOKING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY MAYABROW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 1/3/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketReason: FAHR--FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING BY MAYABROW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 12/1/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: USE OR POSSESS DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Statute: 893.147.1; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO220049984; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 11/30/2022; OBTS : 5308016636; Offense Date : 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: POSSESS OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Statute: 893.13.6A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO220049984; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 11/30/2022; OBTS : 5308016636; Offense Date : 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: POSSESS OF FENTANYL; Statute: 893.13.6A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO220049984; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 11/30/2022; OBTS : 5308016636; Offense Date : 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OTTO WALTER A