This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/19/2021 at 20:46:05 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. KNIGHT PAUL KEITH

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KNIGHT PAUL KEITH. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEITH SPOTO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEITH SPOTO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

KNIGHT PAUL KEITH

Polk City, FL 33868

BRADY PAUL KEITH

KNIGHT KEITH

HEIM MICHAEL

KNIGHT ROGER

BRADY PAUL

HEIME MICHAEL

BRADY ROGER

KNIGHT PAUL

LAKES MICHAEL

NIGHT KEITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITEMAN NEIL E

Attorney at ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY

Assistant State Attorney, Po Box 9000, Drawer Sa

Bartow, FL 33831-9000

 

Court Documents

BOND DISCHARGED/MAILED

01/08/2021: BOND DISCHARGED/MAILED

WRITTEN NOLLE PROSSE

12/28/2020: WRITTEN NOLLE PROSSE

MOTION TO ABATE UPON SUGGESTION OF DEATH

11/16/2020: MOTION TO ABATE UPON SUGGESTION OF DEATH

ORDER OF ABATEMENT

11/10/2020: ORDER OF ABATEMENT

WITHDRAWN CAPIAS RETURNED FROM PCSO

10/26/2020: WITHDRAWN CAPIAS RETURNED FROM PCSO

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 10-21-20

10/22/2020: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 10-21-20

BOND FORFEITURE / BADV

10/22/2020: BOND FORFEITURE / BADV

NOTICE OF INTENT TO INSPECT COPY TEST AND PHOTOGRAPH INFO AND MATERIAL

09/30/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT TO INSPECT COPY TEST AND PHOTOGRAPH INFO AND MATERIAL

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

09/24/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 07/27/2020

07/28/2020: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 07/27/2020

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY -EMAILED CHRISTINE 7/27

07/24/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY -EMAILED CHRISTINE 7/27

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

07/21/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

NOTICE TO APPEAR

07/20/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

BOND -ACC

07/20/2020: BOND -ACC

BOND -ACC

07/20/2020: BOND -ACC

BOND -BADV

07/20/2020: BOND -BADV

BOOKING SHEET

07/20/2020: BOOKING SHEET

APPLICANT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

07/15/2020: APPLICANT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED/MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: KNOWINGLY DRIVE WHILE LIC SUSPENDED REVOKED; Statute: 322.34.2A; Level: M; Degree: S; Status: Amended; Disposition/Action: NOLLE PROSEQUI; Disposition/Action Date: 12/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: KNOWINGLY DRIVE WHILE LIC SUSPENDED REVOKED; Statute: 322.34.2; Level: M; Degree: S; Status: Amended; Disposition/Action: NOLLE PROSEQUI; Disposition/Action Date: 12/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: USE OR POSSESS DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Statute: 893.147.1; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: NOLLE PROSEQUI; Disposition/Action Date: 12/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: POSSESS OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Statute: 893.13.6A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: NOLLE PROSEQUI; Disposition/Action Date: 12/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN NOLLE PROSSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO ABATE UPON SUGGESTION OF DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF ABATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITHDRAWN CAPIAS RETURNED FROM PCSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 10-21-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSESTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 7/27/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 6/27/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFL DRIVER'S LICENSE TRANSCRIPT OF DRIVER RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOKING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED/CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: GRAND THEFT - M/VEHICLE; Statute: 812.014.2C6; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : LDPD200010330; Agency : LAKELAND POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 06/26/2020; OBTS : 5302265888; Offense Date : 06/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: DRIVE WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED 1ST OFFENSE; Statute: 322.34.2A; Level: M; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : LDPD200010330; Agency : LAKELAND POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 06/26/2020; OBTS : 5302265888; Offense Date : 06/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: USE OR POSSESS DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Statute: 893.147.1; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : LDPD200010330; Agency : LAKELAND POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 06/26/2020; OBTS : 5302265888; Offense Date : 06/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: POSSESS OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Statute: 893.13.6A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : LDPD200010330; Agency : LAKELAND POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 06/26/2020; OBTS : 5302265888; Offense Date : 06/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITEMAN NEIL E