This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 10/29/2021 at 16:05:12 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. KIRBY WILLIAM THOMAS

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KIRBY WILLIAM THOMAS. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is J KEVIN ABDONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

J KEVIN ABDONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

ROSE KALIE LARAE

Lakeland, FL 33810

ROSE KALIX LARAE

ROSE KAYLIE LARAE

KIRBY WILLIAM THOMAS II

Lakeland, FL 33815

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DIMMIG HOWARD L II

Public Defender, Po Box 9000, Drawer Pd

Bartow, FL 33831-9000

CHEATWOOD GAIL R

2000 South Florida Avenue

Lakeland, FL 33803

 

Court Documents

NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL , DEMAND DIS (CA CHEATWOOD)

10/20/2021: NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL , DEMAND DIS (CA CHEATWOOD)

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

10/20/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

ORDER WITHDRAWING AND APPOINTING COUNSEL (CA CHEATWOOD)

10/19/2021: ORDER WITHDRAWING AND APPOINTING COUNSEL (CA CHEATWOOD)

DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

10/18/2021: DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (RC ORAZI)

10/18/2021: NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (RC ORAZI)

ORDER WITHDRAWING AND APPOINTING COUNSEL (RC)

10/18/2021: ORDER WITHDRAWING AND APPOINTING COUNSEL (RC)

MOTION TO W/DRAW-CONFLICT OF INTEREST

10/18/2021: MOTION TO W/DRAW-CONFLICT OF INTEREST

AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

10/15/2021: AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 10/15/21

10/15/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 10/15/21

BOOKING SHEET

10/15/2021: BOOKING SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 11/15/2021; Court Time: 1:00 PM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: A2; Judge: EMERGENCY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL , DEMAND DIS (CA CHEATWOOD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WITHDRAWING AND APPOINTING COUNSEL (CA CHEATWOOD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketAPD of Record, BRADSTOCK GUY DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (RC ORAZI)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WITHDRAWING AND APPOINTING COUNSEL (RC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO W/DRAW-CONFLICT OF INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 10/15/2021; Court Time: 1:00 PM; Location: BARTOW 8 E BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: FAHR - FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING; Section: M6; Judge: STACIE LEA KAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSESTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 11/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketReason: FAHR--FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING BY JESSESTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 10/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: VIOL CITY/COUNTY CONTRACT ORDINANCE 1ST VIOL; Statute: 489.127.1I; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042532; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; OBTS : 8888888888; Offense Date : 10/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: UNLAWFUL USE 2-WAY COMMUNICATION DEVICE; Statute: 934.215; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042532; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; OBTS : 8888888888; Offense Date : 10/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: PERFORM WORK W/O BLDG PERMIT 1ST VIOL; Statute: 489.127.1H; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042532; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; OBTS : 8888888888; Offense Date : 10/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: SCHEME TO DEFRAUD; Statute: 817.034.4A3; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042532; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; OBTS : 8888888888; Offense Date : 10/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: ENGAGE CONTRACTING BUSN WO CERTIF 1ST VIOL; Statute: 489.127.1F; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042532; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; OBTS : 8888888888; Offense Date : 10/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: FALSELY IDENTIFY SELF AS CONTRACTOR; Statute: 489.127.1A; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210042532; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 10/14/2021; OBTS : 8888888888; Offense Date : 10/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHEATWOOD GAIL R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIMMIG HOWARD L II