This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/19/2021 at 16:14:26 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HUNT DAVID ARLIE

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HUNT DAVID ARLIE. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEITH SPOTO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEITH SPOTO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

HUNT TOBY LEE

Winter Haven, FL 33880

HUNT DAVID ARLIE

Eloise, FL 33880

HUNT TONY

HUNT DAVID A

HUNT DAVID ARLEE

HUNT DAVID

HATEM REYNALDO

HUNT DAVID ARILE

LAWHORN MARK ANTHONY

Winter Haven, FL 33881

LAWHORN MARK A

HUNT TOBY

LAWHORN MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARDIN III BENJAMIN WALDROP

Attorney at ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY

Assistant State Attorney, Polk County Courthouse

Bartow, FL 33831

Defendant Attorney

MILLS JONATHAN E

160 E Summerlin St., #206

Bartow, FL 33830

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

02/11/2021: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL , WPNG, WA, COPIES, NOT DIS, REQ STATE PART (CA MILLS)

02/10/2021: NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL , WPNG, WA, COPIES, NOT DIS, REQ STATE PART (CA MILLS)

ORDER WITHDRAWING AND APPOINTING COUNSEL (CA MILLS)

02/10/2021: ORDER WITHDRAWING AND APPOINTING COUNSEL (CA MILLS)

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

02/09/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 1/25/21

01/26/2021: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 1/25/21

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

12/30/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 11/30/20

12/02/2020: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 11/30/20

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

11/10/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

10/26/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 10/19/2020

10/22/2020: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 10/19/2020

DEMAND RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY & NOTICE OF ALIBI

10/12/2020: DEMAND RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY & NOTICE OF ALIBI

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

09/18/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF COUNSEL (RC WATSON)

08/26/2020: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF COUNSEL (RC WATSON)

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 07/24/2020

07/27/2020: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 07/24/2020

NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (RC KING)

07/20/2020: NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (RC KING)

DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

07/20/2020: DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

NOTICE OF CASE DIVISION TRANSFER (C:SAO)

07/07/2020: NOTICE OF CASE DIVISION TRANSFER (C:SAO)

INFORMATION FILED

07/06/2020: INFORMATION FILED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 03/08/2021; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: PRET - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Section: F6; Judge: KEITH SPOTO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL , WPNG, WA, COPIES, NOT DIS, REQ STATE PART (CA MILLS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WITHDRAWING AND APPOINTING COUNSEL (CA MILLS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketReason: PRET--PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BY LAWAPERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 3/8/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 1/25/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/25/2021; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: FELONY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE VIRTUAL; Motion: PRET - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Section: F6; Judge: KEITH SPOTO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSESTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 7/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketReason: FAHR--FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING BY JESSESTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 6/16/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: AGG BATTERY CAUSE BODILY HARM OR DISABILITY; Statute: 784.045.1A1; Level: F; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO200023654; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 06/15/2020; Name at Arrest : HUNT DAVID; OBTS : 5301201871; Offense Date : 06/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: ROBBERY BY SUDDEN SNATCHING NO WEAPON; Statute: 812.131.2B; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO200023654; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 06/15/2020; Name at Arrest : HUNT DAVID; OBTS : 5301201871; Offense Date : 06/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: AGG ASSAULT W/WEAPON WITHOUT INTENT TO KILL; Statute: 784.021.1A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO200023654; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 06/15/2020; Name at Arrest : HUNT DAVID; OBTS : 5301201871; Offense Date : 06/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: BURGLARY OF A DWELLING; Statute: 810.02.3A; Level: F; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO200023654; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 06/15/2020; Name at Arrest : HUNT DAVID; OBTS : 5301201871; Offense Date : 06/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: BURG-ASSAULT OR BATTERY DUR; Statute: 810.02.2A; Level: F; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO200023654; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 06/15/2020; Name at Arrest : HUNT DAVID; OBTS : 5301201871; Offense Date : 06/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARDIN III BENJAMIN WALDROP