This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 01/06/2023 at 04:40:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HARTAGE VERNON J

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HARTAGE VERNON J. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MELISSA GRAVITT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MELISSA GRAVITT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

HARTAGE VERNON J

Auburndale, FL 33823

HARRIS VERNON

HARTA VERNON

HARTAGE MICHAEL

MCCANTS BRUCE

GENKSES GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDRES CASSANDRA D

Attorney at ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY

Assistant State Attorney, P O Box 9000 Drawer Sa

Bartow, FL 33831

Defendant Attorney

COTTO AMANDA GAYLE

P O Box 9000 Drawer Pd

Bartow, FL 33830-9000

 

Court Documents

BOOKING SHEET

12/01/2022: BOOKING SHEET

AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

12/01/2022: AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 12/1/22

12/01/2022: FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 12/1/22

DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

12/05/2022: DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

APPLICANT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

12/16/2022: APPLICANT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY EMAILED CHRISTINE/LAUREN

01/02/2023: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY EMAILED CHRISTINE/LAUREN

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/03/2023; Court Time: 8:15 AM; Location: BARTOW MAIN COURTROOM; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: A2; Judge: EMERGENCY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY EMAILED CHRISTINE/LAUREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketASA of Record, ANDRES CASSANDRA D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • FinancialEffective Date: 12/19/2022; Due Date: 11/01/2023; Fee Desc: Felony PD Application Fee;; Fee Amount: 50.00; Total Amount Due: 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: RESIST/OBSTR OFFICER W/OUT VIOLENCE; Statute: 843.02; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: FILED; Disposition/Action Date: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: GIVE FALSE NAME/ID TO LAW ENFORCEMENT; Statute: 901.36.1; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Amended; Disposition/Action: FILED; Disposition/Action Date: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: USE OR POSSESS DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Statute: 893.147.1; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: FILED; Disposition/Action Date: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: POSSESS OF COCAINE; Statute: 893.13.6A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: FILED; Disposition/Action Date: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICANT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOKING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSTORR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 1/3/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketReason: FAHR--FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING BY JESSTORR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 12/1/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: RESIST/OBSTR OFFICER W/OUT VIOLENCE; Statute: 843.02; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : WHPD220006879; Agency : WINTER HAVEN POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 11/30/2022; OBTS : 5308016632; Offense Date : 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: RESIST/OBSTR OFFICER W/OUT VIOLENCE; Statute: 843.02; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : WHPD220006879; Agency : WINTER HAVEN POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 11/30/2022; OBTS : 5308016632; Offense Date : 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: USE OR POSSESS DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Statute: 893.147.1; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : WHPD220006879; Agency : WINTER HAVEN POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 11/30/2022; OBTS : 5308016632; Offense Date : 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: POSSESS OF COCAINE; Statute: 893.13.6A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : WHPD220006879; Agency : WINTER HAVEN POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 11/30/2022; OBTS : 5308016632; Offense Date : 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDRES CASSANDRA D