This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 03/11/2022 at 13:15:25 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HARDCASTLE RONALD JAMES

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HARDCASTLE RONALD JAMES. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DONALD G JACOBSEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DONALD G JACOBSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

HARDCASTLE RONALD JAMES J

Lakeland, FL 33803

HARDCASTLE RONALD J

HARDCASTLE RONALD JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARTMAN KATHERINE SARAH

Attorney at ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY

Assistant State Attorney, P O Box 9000 Drawer Sa

Bartow, FL 33831

Defendant Attorneys

PEARL MICHELA

Public Defender'S Office, P O Box 9000 Drawer Pd

Bartow, FL 33830

THOMPSON JALEN

P O Box 9000 Drawer Public Defender

Bartow, FL 33830-9000

 

Court Documents

CAPIAS ISSUED

12/07/2021: CAPIAS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT COPY FILED

12/07/2021: AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT COPY FILED

ISSUE CAPIAS TAG PER SAO REQUEST

12/07/2021: ISSUE CAPIAS TAG PER SAO REQUEST

AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

12/07/2021: AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

CAPIAS SERVED 12/10/21

12/14/2021: CAPIAS SERVED 12/10/21

BOOKING SHEET

12/14/2021: BOOKING SHEET

BOND -TOMM

12/14/2021: BOND -TOMM

BOND -TOMM

12/14/2021: BOND -TOMM

BOND -TOMM

12/14/2021: BOND -TOMM

BOND -TOMM

12/14/2021: BOND -TOMM

BOND -TOMM

12/14/2021: BOND -TOMM

NOTICE TO APPEAR

12/14/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR

DIRECT INFORMATION FILED

12/07/2021: DIRECT INFORMATION FILED

COURT NOTIFICATION

12/21/2021: COURT NOTIFICATION

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 01/10/22

01/11/2022: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 01/10/22

DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

01/12/2022: DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

COURT NOTIFICATION

02/10/2022: COURT NOTIFICATION

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 03/23/2022; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: PRET - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Section: F3; Judge: DONALD G JACOBSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketAPD of Record, THOMPSON JALEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketReason: PRET--PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BY DEBODOOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 3/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketAPD of Record, PEARL MICHELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 01/10/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/10/2022; Court Time: 8:15 AM; Location: BARTOW 4 D BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: A2; Judge: EMERGENCY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CAPIAS TAG PER SAO REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT COPY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIRECT INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: FRAUDULENT USE PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION INFO; Statute: 817.568.2A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210012572; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 12/10/2021; OBTS : 5309002890; Offense Date : 03/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: GRAND THEFT OVER $750 LESS THAN $5000; Statute: 812.014.2C1; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210012572; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 12/10/2021; OBTS : 5309002890; Offense Date : 03/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: FRAUDULENT USE OF CREDIT CARD; Statute: 817.61; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210012572; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 12/10/2021; OBTS : 5309002890; Offense Date : 03/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: GRAND THEFT OVER $750 LESS THAN $5000; Statute: 812.014.2C1; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210012572; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 12/10/2021; OBTS : 5309002890; Offense Date : 03/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: ARTIFICE TO DEFRAUD A FINANCIAL INSTITUTION; Statute: 655.0322.6; Level: F; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210012572; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 12/10/2021; OBTS : 5309002890; Offense Date : 03/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARTMAN KATHERINE SARAH