This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 03/08/2023 at 17:06:53 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GLOVER DAMARIES AQUIL

Case Summary

On 12/06/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GLOVER DAMARIES AQUIL. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN M KOHL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00BA

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEVIN M KOHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

GLOVER DAMARIES AQUIL

Lakeland, FL 33810

GLOVER DAMARIES A

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT/CITATION/NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

12/06/2022: AFFIDAVIT/CITATION/NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

BOOK-IN SHEET

12/06/2022: BOOK-IN SHEET

FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER

12/06/2022: FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER

MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 12/09/22

12/09/2022: MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 12/09/22

INFORMATION FILED

12/08/2022: INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE DISCOVERY/DEMAND DISCLOSURE MATERIAL FAVORABLE DEFT

12/13/2022: NOTICE DISCOVERY/DEMAND DISCLOSURE MATERIAL FAVORABLE DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WRITTEN PLEA NOT GUILTY/DEM FOR DISC - PA J JOHNSON

12/14/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WRITTEN PLEA NOT GUILTY/DEM FOR DISC - PA J JOHNSON

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/15/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

MOTION & ORDER TO ALLOW PD TO WITHDRAW

12/15/2022: MOTION & ORDER TO ALLOW PD TO WITHDRAW

ORDER ALLOW DEFENDANT COUNSEL WITHDRAW

12/19/2022: ORDER ALLOW DEFENDANT COUNSEL WITHDRAW

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

01/25/2023: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

01/25/2023: NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

JUDGMENT/SENTENCE RECORDED-THIS IS NOT A LIEN 01/26/23

01/26/2023: JUDGMENT/SENTENCE RECORDED-THIS IS NOT A LIEN 01/26/23

MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 01/26/23

01/26/2023: MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 01/26/23

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/26/2023; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: BARTOW 4 C BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: PRET - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Section: M6; Judge: KEVIN M KOHL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DispositionPhase: Court Phase; Description: RESIST/OBSTR OFFICER W/OUT VIOLENCE; Statute: 843.02; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Same; Plea: NOLO CONTENDERE; Disposition/Action: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; Disposition/Action Date: 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • FinancialEffective Date: 01/26/2023; Due Date: 02/27/2023; Fee Desc: Add'l State Attorney Fees;; Fee Amount: 100.00; Total Amount Due: 100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • FinancialEffective Date: 01/26/2023; Due Date: 02/27/2023; Fee Desc: Misd Fine $50 + Surcharge;; Fee Amount: 52.50; Total Amount Due: 52.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • FinancialEffective Date: 01/26/2023; Due Date: 02/27/2023; Fee Desc: Misd: Costs Only/No Fine;; Fee Amount: 273.00; Total Amount Due: 273.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 01/26/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT/SENTENCE RECORDED-THIS IS NOT A LIEN 01/26/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ALLOW DEFENDANT COUNSEL WITHDRAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 12/09/2022; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: BARTOW 4 B RED ELEVATOR; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: M8; Judge: DAVID E STAMEY JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 12/09/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Pros Phase; Description: RESIST/OBSTR OFFICER W/OUT VIOLENCE; Statute: 843.02; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: FILED; Disposition/Action Date: 12/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOK-IN SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT/CITATION/NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY ASHLHARP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 12/9/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial Phase; Description: RESIST/OBSTR OFFICER W/OUT VIOLENCE; Statute: 843.02; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO220015809; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 04/16/2022; Name at Arrest : GLOVER DAMARIES; OBTS : 5309006721; Offense Date : 04/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less