This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/19/2021 at 16:13:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. FOUNTAIN NICHOALS TRAYON

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FOUNTAIN NICHOALS TRAYON. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOB GRODE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00WH

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOB GRODE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

FOUNTAIN NICHOALS TRAYON

Winter Haven, FL 33881

JACKSON TERELL T

FOUNTAIN NICHOALS T

FOUNTAIN NICK

FOUNTAIN NICHOLAS TRAYTON

FOUNTAIN NICHOALS

FOUNTAIN TRAY

JACKSON TERRELL T

FOUNTAIN NICOALS

FOUNTAINE NICHOALS

FOUNTAIN NICHOLS TRAYON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON JERICA BREON

Attorney at ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY

Assistant State Attorney, Polk County Courthouse

Bartow, FL 33831

Defendant Attorney

BEHNSTEDT PATRICE

Attorney at OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

Office Of Public Defender, Po Box 9000 Drawer Pd

Bartow, FL 33831-0000

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

02/03/2021: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 2/2/21

02/02/2021: MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 2/2/21

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

01/07/2021: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 1/5/21

01/06/2021: MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 1/5/21

SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO NOTICE/DEMAND DISCOVERY

11/17/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO NOTICE/DEMAND DISCOVERY

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

11/12/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 11/10/20

11/12/2020: MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 11/10/20

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

11/03/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

10/07/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 10/6/20

10/07/2020: MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 10/6/20

NOTIFICATION FROM POSTMASTER - UNDELIVERABLE

09/22/2020: NOTIFICATION FROM POSTMASTER - UNDELIVERABLE

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

09/03/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 9/1/20

09/02/2020: MEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 9/1/20

NOTIFICATION FROM POSTMASTER - UNDELIVERABLE

08/27/2020: NOTIFICATION FROM POSTMASTER - UNDELIVERABLE

SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO NOTICE/DEMAND DISCOVERY

08/27/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO NOTICE/DEMAND DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF INTENT INSPECT/COPY/TEST/PHOTO INFORM AND MATERIAL

08/19/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT INSPECT/COPY/TEST/PHOTO INFORM AND MATERIAL

ORDER GRANTING MOTION EMERGENCY MOTION TO SET ASIDE CAPIAS / APPOINTMENT OF COUNCEL

07/29/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION EMERGENCY MOTION TO SET ASIDE CAPIAS / APPOINTMENT OF COUNCEL

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

07/28/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 03/30/2021; Court Time: 12:45 PM; Location: NORTHEAST GOVERNMENT CENTER; Motion: MDOC - MANDATORY DOCKET CALL; Section: W3; Judge: BOB GRODE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 03/30/2021; Court Time: 12:45 PM; Location: NORTHEAST GOVERNMENT CENTER; Motion: MDOC - MANDATORY DOCKET CALL HEARING; Section: W3; Judge: BOB GRODE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketReason: MDOC--MANDATORY DOCKET CALL HEARING BY ANGIKING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 3/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 02/02/2021; Court Time: 12:45 PM; Location: NORTHEAST GOVERNMENT CENTER; Motion: PRET - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Section: W3; Judge: BOB GRODE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF SENTENCE/SNAPOUT 2/2/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketReason: PRET--PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BY ANGIKING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 2/2/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/CITATION UNSERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketASA of Record, JACK RAYMOND ALLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY MARTJIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 7/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Pros Phase; Description: WILLFUL VIOL CONDITION OF PTR FOR DOM VIOL; Statute: 741.29.6; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Initiated by Prosecutor/Direct; Disposition/Action: FILED; Disposition/Action Date: 06/16/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE SUMMONS REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF INVESTIGATION COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIRECT INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial Phase; Description: WILLFUL VIOL CONDITION OF PTR FOR DOM VIOL; Statute: 741.29.6; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Not applicable; Agency Report Num : AAPD200001022; Agency : STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE; Offense Date : 04/23/2020; Summons Issue Date : 06/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON JERICA BREON