This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 01/26/2023 at 15:06:46 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. DUNN JOSEPH LEE

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DUNN JOSEPH LEE. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN L BARBER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN L BARBER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DUNN JOSEPH LEE

Davenport, FL 33897-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIFFENKRANZ DAKOTA MARK

Attorney at ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY

Assistant State Attorney, Polk County Courthouse

Bartow, FL 33831

Defendant Attorney

COLEMAN JAYDE REON

Attorney at PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE

Public Defenders Office, P O Box 9000-Pd

Bartow, FL 33881-9000

 

Court Documents

BOOKING SHEET

12/22/2022: BOOKING SHEET

FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 12/22/22

12/22/2022: FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 12/22/22

DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

12/27/2022: DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

12/22/2022: AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

APPLICANT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

01/09/2023: APPLICANT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

01/11/2023: AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY EMAILED CHRISTINA, LAUREN

01/24/2023: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY EMAILED CHRISTINA, LAUREN

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/24/2023; Court Time: 8:15 AM; Location: BARTOW 7 D BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: A2; Judge: EMERGENCY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY EMAILED CHRISTINA, LAUREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketASA of Record, GRIFFENKRANZ DAKOTA MARK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: FRAUD-EVID BY EMP COMPLY CLAIM/INS LESS 20K DOLS; Statute: 440.105.4A1; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: FILED; Disposition/Action Date: 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: FALSELY IDENTIFY SELF AS CONTRACTOR; Statute: 489.127.1A; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: FILED; Disposition/Action Date: 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: G/T OVER $5000 LESS THAN $10,000; Statute: 812.014.2C2; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: FILED; Disposition/Action Date: 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICANT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketAPD of Record, COLEMAN JAYDE REON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 12/22/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOKING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSTORR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 1/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: FRAUD-EVID BY EMP COMPLY CLAIM/INS LESS 20K DOLS; Statute: 440.105.4A1; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO220027980; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 12/21/2022; OBTS : 8888888888; Offense Date : 12/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: FALSELY IDENTIFY SELF AS CONTRACTOR; Statute: 489.127.1A; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO220027980; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 12/21/2022; OBTS : 8888888888; Offense Date : 12/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: G/T OVER $5000 LESS THAN $10,000; Statute: 812.014.2C2; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO220027980; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 12/21/2022; OBTS : 8888888888; Offense Date : 12/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less