This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/19/2021 at 16:36:17 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CAMBRON MANIETTA

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CAMBRON MANIETTA. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DONALD G JACOBSEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DONALD G JACOBSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

SNYDER THOMAS ANDREW

Davenport, FL 33837-9098

WALTON SCOTT ELLSWORTH JR

Wimauma, FL 33598

WALTON SCOTT J

CAMBRON MANIETTA

Haines City, FL 33844

SNYDER ANDY

WALTON SCOTT ELLSWORTH

DELEONSALES BIELMAN ROLANDO

WALTON SCOTT

DELEONSALES BIELMAN

ARIAS-MENDEZ RAMIRO

Haines City, FL 33844

SNYDER THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POWELL ROGER WARREN

Attorney at ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY

Assistant State Attorney, Po Box 9000 Drawer Sao

Bartow, FL 33831-9000

Defendant Attorney

KING CACHINA

P O Box 9000 Drawer Rc-2

Bartow, FL 33831

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

02/17/2021: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 02/15/21

02/16/2021: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 02/15/21

STATE WITNESS LIST

02/15/2021: STATE WITNESS LIST

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

01/13/2021: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 01/04/21

01/05/2021: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 01/04/21

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

12/04/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 11/09/2020

11/10/2020: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 11/09/2020

RETURNED MAIL

10/30/2020: RETURNED MAIL

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

10/20/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 9-29-20

09/30/2020: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 9-29-20

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

09/01/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

SEARCH WARRANT INVENTORY

07/23/2020: SEARCH WARRANT INVENTORY

DEMAND RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY & NOTICE OF ALIBI

07/30/2020: DEMAND RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY & NOTICE OF ALIBI

APPLICATION FOR SEARCH WARRANT

07/23/2020: APPLICATION FOR SEARCH WARRANT

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 07/20/2020

07/21/2020: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 07/20/2020

INFORMATION FILED

07/01/2020: INFORMATION FILED

AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

07/01/2020: AFFID COSTS FOR INVEST / PROSECUTION / EXTRADITION

COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

06/30/2020: COURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 02/24/2021; Court Time: 8:29 AM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: MDOC - MANDATORY DOCKET CALL; Section: F3; Judge: DONALD G JACOBSEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 02/24/2021; Court Time: 8:29 AM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: MDOC - MANDATORY DOCKET CALL HEARING; Section: F3; Judge: DONALD G JACOBSEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 02/15/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 02/15/2021; Court Time: 1:00 PM; Location: FELONY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE VIRTUAL; Motion: PRET - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Section: F3; Judge: DONALD G JACOBSEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE WITNESS LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketRe: MDOC--MANDATORY DOCKET CALL BY ASHLAVIR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 2/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE VIRTUAL COURTROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketReason: PRET--PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BY RAEMATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 6/17/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOKING SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSESTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 7/20/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketReason: FAHR--FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING BY JESSESTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 6/17/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: MAINTAIN PLACE CONT SUBS/PUBLIC NUISANCE; Statute: 823.10; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : HCPD200001981; Agency : HAINES CITY POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 06/16/2020; OBTS : 5302265750; Offense Date : 06/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: USE OR POSSESS DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Statute: 893.147.1; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : HCPD200001981; Agency : HAINES CITY POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 06/16/2020; OBTS : 5302265750; Offense Date : 06/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: POSSESS METHAMPHETAMINE W/INT SELL/DELIVER; Statute: 893.13.1A1; Level: F; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : HCPD200001981; Agency : HAINES CITY POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 06/16/2020; OBTS : 5302265750; Offense Date : 06/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING CACHINA