This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 12/24/2022 at 07:42:19 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BROWN JENNIFER

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BROWN JENNIFER. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE DALY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00BA

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE DALY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BROWN JENNIFER

Lakeland, FL 33812

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT NOTICE MAILED

12/01/2022: PAYMENT NOTICE MAILED

NOTICE OF FILING -ANIMAL CONTROL INCIDENT REPORT

12/01/2022: NOTICE OF FILING -ANIMAL CONTROL INCIDENT REPORT

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

12/01/2022: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - IN PERSON NOTICE MAILED TO DEFT.

12/02/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE - IN PERSON NOTICE MAILED TO DEFT.

NOTICE OF FILING / PLEA WITHDRAWN

12/15/2022: NOTICE OF FILING / PLEA WITHDRAWN

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial Phase; Description: SEC 12 1ST CUST DOG/CAT INJURE PERSON; Statute: 18-068 23 P1; Level: I; Degree: N; Status: Notice to Appear; Disposition/Action Date: 12/15/2022; Agency Report Num : PCACDA221829671; Agency : POLK COUNTY ANIMAL CONTROL DEPARTMENT; NTA Issue Date : 11/21/2022; Offense Date : 11/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial Phase; Description: SEC 4 1ST NOT INNOCULATED/NO TAG; Statute: 18-068 4 1; Level: I; Degree: N; Status: Notice to Appear; Disposition/Action Date: 12/15/2022; Agency Report Num : PCACDA221829671; Agency : POLK COUNTY ANIMAL CONTROL DEPARTMENT; NTA Issue Date : 11/21/2022; Offense Date : 11/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialEffective Date: 12/15/2022; Due Date: 01/01/1900; Fee Desc: BA Co Crim Witness Subpoena;; Fee Amount: 7.00; Total Amount Due: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialEffective Date: 12/15/2022; Due Date: 01/01/1900; Fee Desc: BA Co Crim Witness Subpoena;; Fee Amount: 7.00; Total Amount Due: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialEffective Date: 12/15/2022; Due Date: 01/01/1900; Fee Desc: BA Co Crim Witness Subpoena;; Fee Amount: 7.00; Total Amount Due: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialEffective Date: 12/15/2022; Due Date: 01/01/1900; Fee Desc: BA Co Crim Witness Subpoena;; Fee Amount: 7.00; Total Amount Due: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialEffective Date: 12/15/2022; Due Date: 01/01/1900; Fee Desc: Injury to Person 1st Offense;; Fee Amount: 205.00; Total Amount Due: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialEffective Date: 12/15/2022; Due Date: 01/01/1900; Fee Desc: Not Innoculated/No tag 1st Off;; Fee Amount: 73.00; Total Amount Due: 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 9429059; Receipt Date: 12/15/2022; Receipt Amount: 306.00; Paying Customer: JENNIFER BROWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketWITNESS SUBPOENA SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketWITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED - ACO B. HALL. PCAC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketWITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED - ACO P. COOK PCAC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketWITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED -- ACO RECORDS CUSTODIAN PCAC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - IN PERSON NOTICE MAILED TO DEFT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketReason: NTRL--NON JURY TRIAL BY JAIMCRIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 12/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING -ANIMAL CONTROL INCIDENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCIVIL PENALTY/ORDINANCE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT NOTICE MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant