This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 01/28/2023 at 16:30:03 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BOYLE TRAVIS ROBERT

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BOYLE TRAVIS ROBERT. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN M KOHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00BA

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEVIN M KOHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

BOYLE TRAVIS ROBERT

Bartow, FL 33830

BOYLE TRAVIS

BOYLE TRAVIS R

Bartow, FL 33830

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRIGHT VALERIE

P O Box 9000 Drawer Sao10

Bartow, FL 33831-9000

Defendant Attorney

KAYLOR MATTHEW

Attorney at KAYLOR LAW GROUP

Kaylor Law Group, 3001 Us Highway 98 South

Lakeland, FL 33803-0000

 

Court Documents

BOOK-IN SHEET

12/15/2022: BOOK-IN SHEET

FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 12/15

12/15/2022: FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 12/15

AFFIDAVIT/CITATION/NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

12/15/2022: AFFIDAVIT/CITATION/NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

ORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

12/16/2022: ORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

BOND

12/20/2022: BOND

BOOK-IN SHEET

12/20/2022: BOOK-IN SHEET

DEF SIGNED NOTICE/APPEAR ON DEMAND AT JAIL

12/20/2022: DEF SIGNED NOTICE/APPEAR ON DEMAND AT JAIL

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/21/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WRITTEN PLEA NOT GUILTY/DEM FOR DISC

12/22/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WRITTEN PLEA NOT GUILTY/DEM FOR DISC

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/27/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

REQUEST FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF INVESTIGATION COSTS

12/27/2022: REQUEST FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF INVESTIGATION COSTS

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL

12/27/2022: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/26/2023; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: BARTOW 4 C BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: PRET - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Section: M6; Judge: KEVIN M KOHL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketASA of Record, WRIGHT VALERIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketASA of Record, WRIGHT VALERIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketASA of Record, PYLE ROBERT E JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF INVESTIGATION COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketReason: PRET--PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BY CHRIMARI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 1/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY CHRIMARI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 12/15/2022; Court Time: 1:00 PM; Location: BARTOW 8 E BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: FAHR - FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING; Section: M4; Judge: STACIE L KAYLOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 12/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY ANNACLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 12/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOK-IN SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketVICTIM'S RIGHTS AND CERTIFICATION INSERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT/CITATION/NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketReason: FAHR--FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING BY ALEXELLI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 12/15/2022 / NCCF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DispositionPhase: Initial Phase; Description: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE BATTERY TOUCH OR STRIKE; Statute: 784.03.1A1; Level: M; Degree: F; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : BAPD220003683; Agency : BARTOW POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 12/14/2022; OBTS : 5309015041; Offense Date : 12/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less