This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 10/19/2021 at 06:39:06 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BEST BUY CO INC 34756

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BEST BUY CO INC 34756. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE DALY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00BA

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE DALY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BEST BUY CO INC 34756

Po Box 9450, 8906 Hwy 33 N

Minneapolis, MN 55440

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING / STUB

08/26/2021: NOTICE OF FILING / STUB

ALARM PAYMENT NOTICE MAILED

08/24/2021: ALARM PAYMENT NOTICE MAILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial Phase; Description: POLK CO ALARM CONTROL ORD/PCSO - CLASS VIII; Statute: 97-36C8; Level: I; Degree: N; Status: Notice to Appear; Disposition/Action Date: 08/26/2021; Agency Report Num : PCSOS211962661; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; NTA Issue Date : 07/15/2021; Offense Date : 07/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 8836655; Receipt Date: 08/26/2021; Receipt Amount: 508.00; Paying Customer: BEST BUY CO INC 34756

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING / STUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY DEBOHOLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDELETE HEARING FOR THE DATE: 9/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • FinancialEffective Date: 08/24/2021; Due Date: 09/23/2021; Fee Desc: False Security Alarm VIII - MO; Fee Amount: 508.00; Total Amount Due: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALARM PAYMENT NOTICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY ALEXELLI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 9/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCIVIL PENALTY/ORDINANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Best Buy Co. Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant