This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 07/16/2021 at 16:03:52 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BEST BUY CO INC 34756

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BEST BUY CO INC 34756. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CIVIL TRAFFIC MAGISTRATE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00BA

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CIVIL TRAFFIC MAGISTRATE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BEST BUY CO INC 34756

Po Box 9450, 8906 Hwy 33 N

Minneapolis, MN 55440

 

Court Documents

ALARM PAYMENT NOTICE MAILED

07/06/2021: ALARM PAYMENT NOTICE MAILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 08/26/2021; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: M0; Judge: CIVIL TRAFFIC MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • FinancialEffective Date: 07/06/2021; Due Date: 08/26/2021; Fee Desc: False Security Alarm VIII - MO; Fee Amount: 508.00; Total Amount Due: 508.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALARM PAYMENT NOTICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY ASHLHARP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 8/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCIVIL PENALTY/ORDINANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial Phase; Description: POLK CO ALARM CONTROL ORD/PCSO - CLASS VIII; Statute: 97-36C8; Level: I; Degree: N; Status: Notice to Appear; Agency Report Num : PCSOS211520025; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; NTA Issue Date : 06/01/2021; Offense Date : 06/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Best Buy Co. Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant