This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 01/03/2022 at 18:31:04 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BARRANTI JOHN ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BARRANTI JOHN ANDERSON. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DONALD G JACOBSEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DONALD G JACOBSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

MILLER NATHAN DAVID

Lake Wales, FL 33898

BARRANTI JOHN ANDERSON

Malabar, FL 32905

MILLER NATHAN D

MILLER NATHAN

BARRANTI JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARTMAN KATHERINE SARAH

Attorney at ASSISTANT STATE ATTORNEY

Assistant State Attorneyp O Box 9000 Drawer Sa

Bartow, FL 33831

Defendant Attorneys

DIMMIG HOWARD L II

Public Defenderpo Box 9000, Drawer Pd

Bartow, FL 33831-9000

BRADSTOCK GUY DAVID

Public Defender'S Officep. O. Drawer Pd, Box 9000

Bartow, FL 33831-9000

SHAMA STEPHEN JEFFREY

P.O. Box 9000 Drawer Rc2

Bartow, FL 33830

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

11/04/2021: AFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

BOOKING SHEET

11/04/2021: BOOKING SHEET

FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 11/4/21

11/04/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 11/4/21

MOTION TO W/DRAW-CONFLICT OF INTEREST

11/09/2021: MOTION TO W/DRAW-CONFLICT OF INTEREST

ORDER WITHDRAWING AND APPOINTING COUNSEL (RC)

11/09/2021: ORDER WITHDRAWING AND APPOINTING COUNSEL (RC)

DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

11/10/2021: DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (RC SHAMA)

11/10/2021: NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (RC SHAMA)

INFORMATION FILED

11/22/2021: INFORMATION FILED

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 12/06/21

12/09/2021: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 12/06/21

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 03/22/2022; Court Time: 1:00 PM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: PRET - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Section: F3; Judge: DONALD G JACOBSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketReason: PRET--PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BY DEBODOOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 3/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 12/06/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 12/06/2021; Court Time: 1:00 PM; Location: BARTOW 5 B RED ELEVATOR; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: A2; Judge: EMERGENCY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketASA of Record, ARTMAN KATHERINE SARAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: GIVING FALSE VERIFICATION PAWN BROKER <$300; Statute: 539.001.8B8A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: NO ACTION/MERGE; Disposition/Action Date: 11/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: GRAND THEFT OVER $750 LESS THAN $5000; Statute: 812.014.2C1; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: NO ACTION/MERGE; Disposition/Action Date: 11/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: DEAL STOLEN PROPERTY; Statute: 812.019.1; Level: F; Degree: S; Status: Same; Disposition/Action: FILED; Disposition/Action Date: 11/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Prosecution; Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF - 200 DOLS AND UNDER; Statute: 806.13.1B1; Level: M; Degree: S; Status: Reduced; Disposition/Action: FILED; Disposition/Action Date: 11/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSESTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 12/6/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketReason: FAHR--FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING BY JESSESTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 11/4/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: GIVING FALSE VERIFICATION PAWN BROKER <$300; Statute: 539.001.8B8A; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210043335; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 11/03/2021; Name at Arrest : BARRANTI JOHN; OBTS : 8888888888; Offense Date : 11/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: GRAND THEFT OVER $750 LESS THAN $5000; Statute: 812.014.2C1; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210043335; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 11/03/2021; Name at Arrest : BARRANTI JOHN; OBTS : 8888888888; Offense Date : 11/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: DEAL STOLEN PROPERTY; Statute: 812.019.1; Level: F; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210043335; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 11/03/2021; Name at Arrest : BARRANTI JOHN; OBTS : 8888888888; Offense Date : 10/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF - 1000 DOLS OR MORE; Statute: 806.13.1B3; Level: F; Degree: T; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210043335; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 11/03/2021; Name at Arrest : BARRANTI JOHN; OBTS : 8888888888; Offense Date : 10/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: BURGLARY OF UNOCCUPIED DWELLING UNARMED; Statute: 810.02.3B; Level: F; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : PCSO210043335; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Arrest Date : 11/03/2021; Name at Arrest : BARRANTI JOHN; OBTS : 8888888888; Offense Date : 10/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2001
  • BondBond Number: 01AA022552; Bond Date: 02/17/2001; Bond Amount: 500.00; Bond Type: Surety; Bond Status: EXPIRED; Bond Agent: EASY Booking Number : 013691; Issue Date : 02/17/2001; Filed Date : 02/17/2001; Release Date : 08/11/2021; Agent Info: Bond Agent code : EASY; Name : EASY BAIL BONDS; Address 1 :PO BOX 1624; City : BARTOW; State: FL; Zip : 33831; Phone: 863-533-0063

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARTMAN KATHERINE SARAH