This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 03/11/2022 at 13:38:26 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ADAMS FREDRICOUS ROMAN

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ADAMS FREDRICOUS ROMAN. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DONALD G JACOBSEN and MELISSA GRAVITT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DONALD G JACOBSEN

MELISSA GRAVITT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

ADAMS FREDRICOUS ROMAN

Haines City, FL 33844-4567

ADAMS FREDRICOUS ROMANE

ADAMS FREDRICOUS

ADAMS FREDRICIOUS

ADAMS FREDRICIOUS R

ADAMS FREDRICOUS ROMAINE

ADAMS FREDCRIOUS ROMANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARTMAN KATHERINE SARAH

Assistant State Attorney, P O Box 9000 Drawer Sa

Bartow, FL 33831

SCHOEPPNER NICOLLE

Attorney at OFFICE OF STATE ATTORNEY

Office Of State Attorney, Po Box 9000 Drawer Sa

Bartow, FL 33831-0000

Defendant Attorneys

BRADSTOCK GUY DAVID

Public Defender'S Office, P. O. Drawer Pd, Box 9000

Bartow, FL 33831-9000

EHRHARDT ERIK ANDREW

Attorney at OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

Office Of Regional Counsel, Po Box 9000, Drawer Rc-2

Bartow, FL 33831

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTIFICATION

02/23/2022: COURT NOTIFICATION

SUBPOENA SERVED

02/21/2022: SUBPOENA SERVED

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINGERPRINTS

02/09/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINGERPRINTS

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 02/07/22

02/09/2022: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 02/07/22

MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 01/18/22

01/24/2022: MEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 01/18/22

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED

01/04/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING FILED

MOTION FOR FINGERPRINTS

01/04/2022: MOTION FOR FINGERPRINTS

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF COUNSEL (RC EHRHARDT)

01/03/2022: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF COUNSEL (RC EHRHARDT)

MOTION/ORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION F1

12/30/2021: MOTION/ORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION F1

MOTION TO TRANSFER DIVISION

12/30/2021: MOTION TO TRANSFER DIVISION

COURT NOTIFICATION

12/29/2021: COURT NOTIFICATION

DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

12/20/2021: DEMAND/NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (RC JOHNSON)

12/20/2021: NOTICE APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (RC JOHNSON)

NOTICE TO APPEAR

12/16/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR

BOND -REED

12/16/2021: BOND -REED

BOOKING SHEET

12/16/2021: BOOKING SHEET

ORDER WITHDRAWING AND APPOINTING COUNSEL (RC)

12/15/2021: ORDER WITHDRAWING AND APPOINTING COUNSEL (RC)

INFORMATION FILED

12/14/2021: INFORMATION FILED

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 04/25/2022; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: PRET - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Section: F1; Judge: MELISSA GRAVITT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINGERPRINTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 02/07/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 02/07/2022; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: BARTOW 6 D BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: MOTN - HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS; Section: F1; Judge: MELISSA GRAVITT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketReason: PRET--PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BY DEBODOOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 4/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMO OF COURT (SNAPOUT) 01/18/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 01/18/2022; Court Time: 8:15 AM; Location: BARTOW 4 D BLUE ELEVATOR; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: A2; Judge: EMERGENCY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE HEARING ORDER 12/13/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOOKING SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketRe: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY JESSTORR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 1/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketRe: FAHR--FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING BY JESSTORR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 12/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2021
  • DispositionPhase: Initial; Description: AGG BATTERY PERSON USES A DEADLY WEAPON; Statute: 784.045.1A2; Level: F; Degree: S; Status: Arrest; Agency Report Num : HCPD210004085; Agency : HAINES CITY POLICE DEPT.; Arrest Date : 12/13/2021; OBTS : 8888888888; Offense Date : 12/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARTMAN KATHERINE SARAH