This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 09/12/2023 at 16:06:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GAMESTOP

Case Summary

On 08/29/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GAMESTOP. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Polk County Courthouse - Bartow Branch located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE DALY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00BA

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE DALY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GAMESTOP

 

Court Documents

ALARM PAYMENT NOTICE MAILED

09/07/2023: ALARM PAYMENT NOTICE MAILED

 

Docket Entries

09/28/2023

HearingCourt Date: 09/28/2023; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: BARTOW COURTHOUSE; Motion: ARRG - ARRAIGNMENT; Section: M0; Judge: CHRISTINE DALY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

FinancialEffective Date: 09/07/2023; Due Date: 09/28/2023; Fee Desc: False Security Alarm VIII - MO;; Fee Amount: 508.00; Total Amount Due: 508.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketALARM PAYMENT NOTICE MAILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketReason: ARRG--ARRAIGNMENT BY APRIBAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketINSERT HEARING FOR THE DATE: 9/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketCIVIL PENALTY/ORDINANCE FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

DispositionPhase: Initial Phase; Description: POLK CO ALARM CONTROL ORD/PCSO - CLASS VIII; Statute: 97-36C8; Level: I; Degree: N; Status; Agency Report Num : PCSOS232062375; Agency : POLK COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Offense Date : 07/25/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less