This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 10/07/2020 at 20:14:40 (UTC).

ZIYANI, SAID E

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 ZIYANI, SAID E was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

ZIYANI, AMPARO

ZIYANI, MIRIAM

ZIYANI, VANESSA

Decedent

ZIYANI, SAID E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

HORTON MICHAEL G

900 West Highway 50

Clermont, FL 34711

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDISCLAIMER - VANESSA ZIYANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketWAIVER-NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION - VANESSA ZIYANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketWAIVER BOND BY IP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (E-FILED COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (E-FILED COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketWAIVER-NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION - MIRIAM ZIYANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDISCLAIMER - MIRIAM ZIYANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketWAIVER BOND BY IP - MIRIAM ZIYANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPETITION WAIVE BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketOATH PR/DESIGNATION RES AGENT/ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-OPENS FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less