This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 16:36:36 (UTC).

WILLIAMSON PHILLIP vs. STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/30/2018 WILLIAMSON PHILLIP filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN L SELPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEVEN L SELPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAMSON PHILLIP

WILLIAMSON JOANNE

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra, 7401 Cypress Gardens Blvd.

Winter Haven, FL 33888

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MULLINAX MATTHEW

4617 Us Highway 19

New Port Richey, FL 33652

Defendant Attorney

SMITH BURKS A III

P O Box 3942

St Petersburg, FL 33731

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/30/2018: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/30/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketAPPRAISAL AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • FinancialDate: 10/31/2018; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: MATTHEW MULLINAX; Receipt Number: 7767083

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less