Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/19/2021 at 21:44:13 (UTC).

WILCOX CHRISTOPHER B. vs. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 WILCOX CHRISTOPHER B filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILCOX CHRISTOPHER B.

Lakeland, FL 33801

Defendant

WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP DBA WALMART #859

Ct Corporation System, 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON DAVID F

211 S. Florida Ave

Lakeland, FL 33801

Defendant Attorney

RODRIGUEZ JACKELINE

150 Southeast Second Ave., Ste. 1200

Miami, FL 33131-2332

 

Court Documents

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- WAL MART STORES EAST LP BY SERVING MONICKA CREARY

07/22/2020: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- WAL MART STORES EAST LP BY SERVING MONICKA CREARY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT WALMART STORES EAST LP SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketWAL MART STORES EAST L PS NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RE-NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF CHRISTOPHER WILCOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RE NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF CHRISTOPHER WILCOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketWAL MART STORES EAST LPS NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAL MART INCS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- WAL MART STORES EAST LP BY SERVING MONICKA CREARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • FinancialDate: 07/13/2020; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: BURNETTI PA; Receipt Number: 8398819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ WALMART STORES EAST LP DBA WALMART #859

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT WALMART STORES EAST LP DBA WALMART #859

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT WALMART STORES EAST LP DBA WALMART 859

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores East, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSON DAVID F