This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 03/09/2023 at 02:06:26 (UTC).

WHISPERING TRAILS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WINTER vs. CANCEL, JOSPEH R J

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 WHISPERING TRAILS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WINTER filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CANCEL, JOSPEH R J. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRANDON J RAFOOL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRANDON J RAFOOL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHISPERING TRAILS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WINTER HAVEN INC

Defendants

CANCEL, JOSPEH R JR

RIVERA SANTANA, YADIRA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • DispositionParty: YADIRA RIVERA SANTANA; Disposition Code: JDIS; Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Date: 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DispositionParty: JOSPEH R CANCEL; Disposition Code: JDIS; Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Date: 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketPREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION AND TO DISMISS WITHOUT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION AND TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - STREAMLINED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - JOSEPH R CANCEL JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-YADIRA RIVERA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • FinancialDate: 10/10/2022; Amount: 325.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9347781

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-YADIRA SANTANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-JOSEPH CANCEL JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less