This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/15/2022 at 23:50:26 (UTC).

WHEELER JENNIFER vs. MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP FLORIDA, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 WHEELER JENNIFER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP FLORIDA, LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CATHERINE L COMBEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CATHERINE L COMBEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNIFER WHEELER, AS THE PARENT AND NATURAL GUARDIAN OF A.W., A MINOR

Defendant

MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP FLORIDA, LLC DBA LEGOLAND FLORIDA

C/O Glenn R Padget, Pa As Registered Agent, 1452 N Us Highway 1

Ormond Beach, FL 32174

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRIGHT JOSHUA D

201 N Franklin St 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

VALASHINAS KIMBERLY

1000 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway Suite 590

Sunrise, FL 33323

 

Court Documents

ORDER REGARDING RULE 1.360 EXAMINATION

01/06/2022: ORDER REGARDING RULE 1.360 EXAMINATION

PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED LIST OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS FOR TRIAL

10/05/2021: PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED LIST OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS FOR TRIAL

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION BY ZOOM

08/25/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION BY ZOOM

ORDER SCHEUDLING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING MEDIATION -VIRTUAL

08/09/2021: ORDER SCHEUDLING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING MEDIATION -VIRTUAL

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP

07/21/2021: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/18/2021: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP FL LLC DBA LEGOLAND FLORIDAS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR

05/12/2021: DEFENDANT MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP FL LLC DBA LEGOLAND FLORIDAS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/06/2021: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANTS DISCLOSURE OF STAFF COUNSEL STATUS AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

05/06/2021: DEFENDANTS DISCLOSURE OF STAFF COUNSEL STATUS AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

05/06/2021: DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/30/2021: ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

AMENDED MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/11/2021: AMENDED MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

REVIEWED BY JUDGE NO ACTION TAKEN AT THIS TIME -MOTION AND ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/11/2021: REVIEWED BY JUDGE NO ACTION TAKEN AT THIS TIME -MOTION AND ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION AND ORDER TO TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/03/2021: MOTION AND ORDER TO TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION AND ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/03/2021: MOTION AND ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP FLORIDA LLC DBA LEGOLAND FLORIDA

02/19/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP FLORIDA LLC DBA LEGOLAND FLORIDA

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS

02/18/2021: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

02/18/2021: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 06/07/2022; Court Time: 9:00 AM; Location: CIVIL DIVISION 07 VIRTUAL; Motion: PTC - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Section: 07; Judge: CATHERINE L COMBEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REGARDING RULE 1.360 EXAMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS VERIFIED RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFS NOTICE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEXAMINATION PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.360

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION AND ORDER TO TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION AND ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • FinancialDate: 02/19/2021; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: MORGAN AND MORGAN; Receipt Number: 8616901

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP FLORIDA LLC DBA LEGOLAND FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSION AND SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALASHINAS , KIMBERLY MURPHY