This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/19/2022 at 23:25:21 (UTC).

WEST COAST SERVICING INC vs. UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WARREN D. PHILLIPS

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 WEST COAST SERVICING INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WARREN D PHILLIPS. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CATHERINE L COMBEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CATHERINE L COMBEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST COAST SERVICING INC

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WARREN D. PHILLIPS

Lakeland, FL 33813

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

Lakeland, FL 33813

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

Lakeland, FL 33813

PHILLIPS, WARREN D

Lakeland, FL 33813

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIAZ ROY A

499 Nw 70Th Ave Suite 309

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33317

Defendant Attorney

CONRIQUE ELAYNE M

746 N Magnolia Ave

Orlando, FL 32803

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

10/05/2021: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

10/05/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

10/05/2021: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/05/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WARREN D PHILLIPS

10/07/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WARREN D PHILLIPS

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

10/07/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

10/07/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ WARREN D PHILLIPS

10/07/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ WARREN D PHILLIPS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

11/08/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • DispositionParty: WARREN D PHILLIPS; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 02/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DispositionParty: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 02/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DispositionParty: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WARREN D. PHILLIPS; Disposition Code: DBHO; Description: DISM BEF HRG OTHER; Date: 02/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketPHILLIPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ISSUED/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WARREN D PHILLIPS, UNKNOWN TENANT 1 NKA TREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DispositionParty: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2; Disposition Code: OTHR; Description: OTHER; Date: 11/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WARREN D PHILLIPS BY SERVING DAPHNE PHILIPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • FinancialDate: 10/07/2021; Amount: 950.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: ROY A DIAZ; Receipt Number: 8883510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ WARREN D PHILLIPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WARREN D PHILLIPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST COAST SERVICING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diaz, Roy Alan