This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 21:32:57 (UTC).

WATSON, ANNIE LEE

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 WATSON, ANNIE LEE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

WATSON, JOHNNIE LEE

WATSON, JAMES A. J

Decedent

WATSON, ANNIE LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

MILLER RICHARD ALAN

Attorney at MILLER, CROSBY & MILLER

Miller, Crosby & Miller, P O Box 8169

Lakeland, FL 33802-8169

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketAMENDED INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketINVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketPROOF SERVICE NOTICE OF ADMIN ATT/RECEIPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketOATH PR/DESIGNATION RES AGENT/ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-OPENS FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less