This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 03/09/2023 at 16:40:38 (UTC).

WARD VINCENT vs. HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 WARD VINCENT filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WARD, VINCENT

WARD, DAWNA

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KADIR ALI A

WHITESELL SHANNON M

Defendant Attorneys

LOUIS MARCUS

QUINTERO CHRISTIE L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketATTORNEY INFORMATION AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF RECORD ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM AND DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING PRIVILEGE LOG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS RULE 1.310 NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO-RECORDED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT COUNT II FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketHERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • FinancialDate: 11/03/2022; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9378002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMAPNY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF VINCENT WARDS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF VINCENT WARDS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF VINCENT WARDS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 1-57.4 IN RE PHSE 2 COVID-19 EMERGENCY COURT OPERATIONS PROCEDURES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less