This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/16/2022 at 19:34:42 (UTC).

WANZEK SARAH JOHANN vs. WANZEK SHAWN DAVID

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 WANZEK SARAH JOHANN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WANZEK SHAWN DAVID. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY P BUTZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00LK

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY P BUTZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANZEK SARAH JOHANN

Defendant

WANZEK SHAWN DAVID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON REPRESENTATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketReason: FH_DOM_MSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 07/27/2021 09:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketADDENDUM TO PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketUNDELIVERED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION AND REDIRECTION TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 07/27/2021 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FROM NONLAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less