This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/06/2020 at 23:37:19 (UTC).

WALKER, CATHERINE ANN

Case Summary

On 05/07/2018 WALKER, CATHERINE ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K STARGEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K STARGEL

 

Party Details

Decedent

WALKER, CATHERINE ANN

Not Yet Classified

SLOAN, BEVERLY A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE-CLOSES FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketINVENTORY (AMENDED INVENTORY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketRECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY & CONSENT TO DISTRIBUTION/ DISCHARGE - BEVERLY A SLOAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketREGIONAL HEALTH, WATSON CLINIC LLP, CAPITAL ONE BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE- PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY- BEVERLY A. SLOAN, LAKELAND

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF SERVICE NOTICE OF ADMIN ATT/RECEIPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketDEATH CERT. (CERT.COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketOATH PR/DESIGNATION RES AGENT/ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION-OPENS FORMAL

    Read MoreRead Less