This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County on 02/16/2021 at 23:17:43 (UTC).

WAGNER JINNY LYN vs. E.S.P. AVIATION LLC

Case Summary

On 04/14/2020 WAGNER JINNY LYN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against E S P AVIATION LLC. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GERALD P HILL II and DANA Y MOORE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GERALD P HILL II

DANA Y MOORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAGNER JINNY LYN

Miami, FL 33130

Defendants

WOODWARD INC

C/O Secretary Of State, Po Box 6327

Tallahassee, FL 32314-

HARTZELL PROPELLER INC

Corporation Service Company, 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301-

LYCOMING ENGINES, A DIVISION OF AVCO CORPORATION

C/O Secretary Of State, Po Box 6327

Tallahassee, FL 32314-

E.S.P. AVIATION LLC

C/O Secretary Of State, Po Box 6327

Tallahassee, FL 32314

AMPHIBIANS PLUS LLC

Harry D Shannon, Registered Agent, 5508 Airport Blvd

Bartow, FL 33830-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARKS STEVEN C

One S.E. 3Rd Ave., Ste. 2700

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

SIBONI MICHAEL C

307 Northwest Third St

Ocala, FL 34475

EVANGELISTA JAMES J

1801 North Highland Avenue, P O Box 3913 Tampa Fl 33601

Tampa, FL 33601

BOURGEORIS L ROBERT

501 East Kennedy Blvd Suite 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

MUSZYNSKI ALEXANDER III

260 Wekiva Springs Rd., Ste. 2000

Longwood, FL 32779

TORRICELLA JR ROBERTO A

4551 Ponce De Leon Blvd

Coral Gables, FL 33146

 

Court Documents

NON-PARTY CARMELLE NGALAMULUME'S MOTION TO QUASH OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND

12/23/2020: NON-PARTY CARMELLE NGALAMULUME'S MOTION TO QUASH OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INSPECTION

12/22/2020: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INSPECTION

DEFENDANT ESP AVIATION LLCS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/25/2020: DEFENDANT ESP AVIATION LLCS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

11/19/2020: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - WOODWARD INC

10/14/2020: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - WOODWARD INC

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT E S P AVIATION LLCS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/09/2020: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT E S P AVIATION LLCS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

HARTZELL PROPELLER INCS NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS PERSONAL JURISDICTIO

09/18/2020: HARTZELL PROPELLER INCS NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS PERSONAL JURISDICTIO

HARTZELL PROPELLERS INCS NOTICE OF FILING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS PERSONAL

09/18/2020: HARTZELL PROPELLERS INCS NOTICE OF FILING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS PERSONAL

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS INTERROGATORIES

09/08/2020: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF AMPHIBIANS PLUS

09/04/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF AMPHIBIANS PLUS

LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

09/01/2020: LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

DEFENDANT E S P AVIATION LLCS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

08/10/2020: DEFENDANT E S P AVIATION LLCS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT HARTZELL PROPELLER INCS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISIDICTION AND

08/07/2020: DEFENDANT HARTZELL PROPELLER INCS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISIDICTION AND

DEFENDANT ESP AVIATION LLCS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF AMENDED COMPLAINT

08/06/2020: DEFENDANT ESP AVIATION LLCS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF AMENDED COMPLAINT

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - AMPHIBIANS PLUS LLC

06/01/2020: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - AMPHIBIANS PLUS LLC

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - HARTZELL PROPELLER INC

05/28/2020: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - HARTZELL PROPELLER INC

PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS

04/14/2020: PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS

COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH

04/14/2020: COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2021
  • Docket8 2021 ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS AVCO CORPORATIONS AND HARTZELL PROPELLER INCS JOINT MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF FEBURARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 02/23/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT ESP AVIATION LLCS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO PERSONAL JURISDICTION DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT WOODWARD INC INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT WOODWARD INC REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ WOODWARD INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ LYCOMING ENGINES, A DIVISION OF AVCO CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ HARTZELL PROPELLER INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ E.S.P. AVIATION LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ AMPHIBIANS PLUS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hartzell Propeller, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LYCOMING ENGINES, A DIVISION OF AVCO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Woodward on behalf of CWS Compensation., Robert N is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARKS STEVEN C