This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 02/18/2022 at 05:26:59 (UTC).

VL AVIATION LLC vs. MILLER, STEVE M

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 VL AVIATION LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MILLER, STEVE M. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HOPE M PATTEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************00LK

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HOPE M PATTEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VL AVIATION LLC

C/O William C. Van Law Iii, Manager/Owner, 627 Brightwaters Blvd E

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

MILLER, STEVE M (COUNTER)

Defendants

MILLER, STEVE M

Lakeland, FL 33811

FIXED WING AVIATION MAINTENANCE,

VL AVIATION LLC (COUNTER)

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

02/16/2022: ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR TRIAL - DARREN TILMAN

02/16/2022: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR TRIAL - DARREN TILMAN

SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR TRIAL - BLAKE REISCHMAN

02/16/2022: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR TRIAL - BLAKE REISCHMAN

MOTION TO ALLOW WITNESS

01/19/2022: MOTION TO ALLOW WITNESS

WITNESS LIST

01/19/2022: WITNESS LIST

EVIDENSE & WITNESS LIST

01/19/2022: EVIDENSE & WITNESS LIST

SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR TRIAL

01/13/2022: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR TRIAL

LETTER FROM DEPUTY CLERK RE: SUBPOENA FEE AND ADDRESS ON SUBPOENA

01/05/2022: LETTER FROM DEPUTY CLERK RE: SUBPOENA FEE AND ADDRESS ON SUBPOENA

SUBPOENA (TO BE ISSUED)

01/04/2022: SUBPOENA (TO BE ISSUED)

SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR TRIAL

12/30/2021: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR TRIAL

ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

11/18/2021: ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL

10/12/2021: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL

VIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR

06/11/2021: VIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED VIRTUAL MEDIATION - VL AVIATION, LLC

09/09/2021: NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED VIRTUAL MEDIATION - VL AVIATION, LLC

NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED VIRTUAL MEDIATION - FIXED WING AVIATION MAINTENANCE

09/09/2021: NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED VIRTUAL MEDIATION - FIXED WING AVIATION MAINTENANCE

NOTICE OF VIRTUAL MEDIATION - FIXED WING AVIATION MAINTENANCE

08/30/2021: NOTICE OF VIRTUAL MEDIATION - FIXED WING AVIATION MAINTENANCE

NOTICE OF VIRTUAL MEDIATION - VL AVIATION, LLC

08/30/2021: NOTICE OF VIRTUAL MEDIATION - VL AVIATION, LLC

COUNTER CLAIM

07/23/2021: COUNTER CLAIM

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • HearingCourt Date: 03/17/2022; Court Time: 9:00 AM; Location: LAKELAND GOVERNMENT CENTER; Motion: NTRL - NON JURY TRIAL; Section: L1; Judge: HOPE M PATTEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR TRIAL - DARREN TILMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR TRIAL - BLAKE REISCHMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketReason: NTRL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 03/17/2022 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 02/11/2022 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO ALLOW WITNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketReason: NTRL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 02/11/2022 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketReason: NTRL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 10/15/2021 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketSTEVE M MILLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialDate: 06/11/2021; Amount: 310.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: WILLIAM C. VAN LAW III; Receipt Number: 8748879

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVIRTUAL/VIDEO SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 07/12/2021 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less