This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 06/26/2022 at 22:11:34 (UTC).

VERGES REGLA vs. UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/27/2022 VERGES REGLA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D SITES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D SITES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERGES, REGLA

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Stephen, 1110 W Commercial Blvd

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA DAVID

250 N Orange Avenue Suite 605

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

ROSSI CHANEL C

2005 Vista Parkway Suite 210

West Palm Beach, FL 33411

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/27/2022: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketRESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCES COMPANYS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDONAGHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INURANCE COMPANY BY SERVING STEPHEN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • FinancialDate: 04/27/2022; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 9135782

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketPLANTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA DAVID