This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 14:04:55 (UTC).

VENABLE TODD J vs. FANGER CAMERON B

Case Summary

On 10/25/2018 VENABLE TODD J filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against FANGER CAMERON B. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES A YANCEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES A YANCEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VENABLE TODD J

Defendant

FANGER CAMERON B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - CAMERON B FANGER 1/7/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketSERVICE PACKET FINAL INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - CAMERON FANGER 11-19-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketReason: TEMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 12/17/2018 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketSERVICE PACKET PARTY SERVED IN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketINJUNCTION AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketSERVICE PACKET PARTY SERVED IN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketINJUNCTION EXTENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketReason: TEMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 11/05/2018 08:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketSERVICE PACKET TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketINJUNCTION APPROVAL SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less