This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/18/2022 at 19:33:00 (UTC).

VELEZ, JOSE M vs. SUPERIOR FENCE AND RAIL INC

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 VELEZ, JOSE M filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SUPERIOR FENCE AND RAIL INC. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KEVIN M KOHL and MARY CATHERINE GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KEVIN M KOHL

MARY CATHERINE GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELEZ, JOSE M

Auburndale, FL 33823

Defendant

SUPERIOR FENCE AND RAIL INC

3060 Dundee Road

Winter Haven, FL 33884

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/13/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - SUPERIOR FENCE AND RAIL INC

07/13/2021: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - SUPERIOR FENCE AND RAIL INC

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - SUPERIOR FENCE AND RAIL INC

07/21/2021: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - SUPERIOR FENCE AND RAIL INC

TRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

09/01/2021: TRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

MEDIATION NON-AGREEMENT

09/01/2021: MEDIATION NON-AGREEMENT

ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL

09/10/2021: ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/22/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 10/28/2021 01:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DispositionParty: SUPERIOR FENCE AND RAIL INC; Disposition Code: DSAH; Description: DISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Date: 10/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 10/28/2021 01:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • DocketReason: NTRL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 10/28/2021 01:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketReason: NTRL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 10/28/2021 01:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 09/01/2021; Court Time: 8:30 AM; Location: BARTOW SMALL CLAIMS/EVICTIONS VIRTUAL; Motion: PRTC - PRE-TRIAL HEARING; Section: M2; Judge: MARY CATHERINE GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION NON-AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRIAL MEMO / PRE-TRIAL MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - SUPERIOR FENCE AND RAIL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialDate: 07/13/2021; Amount: 185.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: JOSE VELEZ; Receipt Number: 8784665

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - SUPERIOR FENCE AND RAIL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 09/01/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Fence & Rail Inc is a litigant