This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 18:32:40 (UTC).

VAZQUEZ SOTO ADA OBO vs. RIVERA MILTON A

Case Summary

On 12/22/2017 VAZQUEZ SOTO ADA OBO filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against RIVERA MILTON A. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANA Y MOORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANA Y MOORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RODRIGUEZ ADARIS I

VAZQUEZ SOTO ADA OBO

Defendant

RIVERA MILTON A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED MILLTON A RIVERA 01/08/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED MILTON A RIVERA 12/22/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketSERVICE PACKET FINAL INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketLETTER FROM MILTON RIVERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- MILTON RIVERA 12-22-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketSERVICE PACKET TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketINJUNCTION APPROVAL SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketReason: TEMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 01/03/2018 08:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less