This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 20:54:11 (UTC).

VARGAS TIRSA vs. CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 VARGAS TIRSA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D SITES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D SITES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARGAS TIRSA

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant

CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gains St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA DAVID

250 N Orange Avenue Suite 605

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

FRANKLIN JONATHAN D

9155 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1710

Miami, FL 33156

STEINMANN WILLIAM

9155 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1710

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

12/17/2021: COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

12/17/2021: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY

01/07/2022: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCLEAR BLUE ANSWER DEFENSES AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR CLEAR BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR CLEAR BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR CLEAR BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • FinancialDate: 12/20/2021; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: EPORTAL - CIVIL LAW; Receipt Number: 8966104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY WITH PROPOSED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketPLAI NTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA DAVID