This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 00:59:35 (UTC).

US FOODS INC vs. THE EGG HOUSE RESTAURANT LLC

Case Summary

On 06/20/2018 US FOODS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THE EGG HOUSE RESTAURANT LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD P HILL II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GERALD P HILL II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US FOODS INC

5104 S Westshore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611

Defendants

NIKOLAIDS MICHAEL

Winterhaven, FL 33884-

THE EGG HOUSE RESTAURANT LLC

612 Hwy 60 East

Lake Wales, FL 33853

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/03/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM BEFORE TRIAL

12/13/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM BEFORE TRIAL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

12/12/2018: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM BEFORE TRIAL

11/28/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM BEFORE TRIAL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

08/29/2018: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/22/2018: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/02/2018: SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVING REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

07/26/2018: NOTICE OF SERVING REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/24/2018: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/24/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

07/09/2018: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESSES

07/06/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/06/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- MICHAEL NIKOLAIDIS BY SERVING FAYE NIKOLAIDIS

07/05/2018: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- MICHAEL NIKOLAIDIS BY SERVING FAYE NIKOLAIDIS

SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-THE EGG HOUSE RESTAURANT

06/27/2018: SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-THE EGG HOUSE RESTAURANT

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ MICHAEL NIKOLAIDS

06/21/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ MICHAEL NIKOLAIDS

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ THE EGG HOUSE RESTAURANT LLC

06/21/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ THE EGG HOUSE RESTAURANT LLC

COMPLAINT

06/20/2018: COMPLAINT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • DispositionParty: MICHAEL NIKOLAIDS; Disposition Code: JDIS; Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Date: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DispositionParty: THE EGG HOUSE RESTAURANT LLC; Disposition Code: JDIS; Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Date: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO CALCULATION OF INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - RECEIVED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- MICHAEL NIKOLAIDIS BY SERVING FAYE NIKOLAIDIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-THE EGG HOUSE RESTAURANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • FinancialDate: 06/21/2018; Amount: 420.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: RALPH MARCADIS ESQUIRE; Receipt Number: 7628967

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ MICHAEL NIKOLAIDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ THE EGG HOUSE RESTAURANT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less