This case was last updated from Polk County Florida Courts on 09/18/2022 at 05:43:50 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OF DEBRA A HARVEY DECEASED

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OF DEBRA A HARVEY DECEASED. This case was filed in Polk County Florida Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D SITES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D SITES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET SECURITIES CORPORATION MORTGAGA LOAN TRUST 2007-BNCI MORTGA

Defendants

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEE, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTES A OF DEBRA A HARVEY DECEASED

Lakeland, FL 33805

DIXON, ROBERT L

Lakeland, FL 33805

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

CLERK OF THE COURTS FOR POLK COUNTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARASOLER TRACY

6409 Congress Ave Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorney

PARKER LEANN P

Drawer Cc-19 Post Office Box 9000

Bartow, FL 33831

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - CLERK OF THE COURTS FOR POLK COUNTY

08/01/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - CLERK OF THE COURTS FOR POLK COUNTY

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - ROBERT L DIXON

08/01/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - ROBERT L DIXON

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

08/01/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS,

08/01/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS,

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

07/29/2022: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

07/29/2022: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - ROBERT L DIXON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-ROBERT DIXON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED CLERK OF HE COURTS FOR POLK COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF DEBRA A HARVEY DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES AND TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketORDER ON DEFENDANT POLK COUNTY CLERK OF COURTS MOTION TO BE EXCUSED FROM ALL PRETRIAL MATTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCONFERENCES AND TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT POLK COUNTY CLERK OF COURTS MOTION TO BE EXCUSED FROM PRETRIAL MATTERS CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCREDITORS, TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF DEBRA A. HARVEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - ROBERT L DIXON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - CLERK OF THE COURTS FOR POLK COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA. STAT 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases where Clerk of the Court of Brwd Cty is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Starasoler, Tracy, ESQ.