Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 06/06/2021 at 22:11:13 (UTC).

UNGER ASHLEY vs. FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 UNGER ASHLEY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION, INC. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CATHERINE L COMBEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CATHERINE L COMBEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNGER ROBERT

UNGER ASHLEY

Lutz, FL 33548

Defendant

FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION, INC.

P. O. Box 14249

Tallahassee, FL 32317

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALERMO CHRISTOPHER

258 Crystal Grove Blvd Suite 101

Lutz, FL 33548

Defendant Attorney

MCHAFFIE JULIE

4301 West Boy Scout Blvd., Ste. 400

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

04/07/2021: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

04/07/2021: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • FinancialDate: 04/08/2021; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER PAL; Receipt Number: 8673377

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA INS. GUARANTY ASSOCIATION, INC is a litigant