This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County on 02/10/2020 at 19:38:33 (UTC).

UCMS LLC., DBA UNIVERSAL CONTRACTING OF FLORIDA vs. STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 UCMS LLC , DBA UNIVERSAL CONTRACTING OF FLORIDA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Polk County, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WAYNE DURDEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WAYNE DURDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UCMS LLC., DBA UNIVERSAL CONTRACTING OF FLORIDA A FOREIGN LLC A/A/O RICARDO NAVARRO AND JANE GRIFFIN

2423 58Th Street South

Gulfport, FL 33707

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

One State Farm Plaza

Bloomington, IL 61710

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KOVAR JAY ESQ

2423 58Th St. S

Gulfport, FL 33707

POPP ANDREW ESQ

6617 Gulfport Blvd S

South Pasadena, FL 33707

Defendant Attorney

MOLHEM DAVID W

320 W Kennedy Boulevard Suite 330

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

DCA ORDER

06/24/2019: DCA ORDER

DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/21/2019: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEAL

06/05/2019: NOTICE OF APPEAL

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING

05/21/2019: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING

04/30/2019: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ABATE LITIGATION AND DISCOVERY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

11/07/2018: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ABATE LITIGATION AND DISCOVERY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

09/28/2018: REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT

09/28/2018: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/28/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketDCA ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY FEE REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY FEE REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketFEES & COSTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORY QUESTIONS UPON DEFENDANT AND ITS COUNSEL (ON ATTORNEYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketFEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING PLAINTIFFS DEMAND FOR ATTORNEYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING COPY OF CERTIFIED POLICY INSURANCE-ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • FinancialDate: 10/01/2018; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: SEAN SAVAL; Receipt Number: 7735323

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ucms Llc is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Florida Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Molhem, David W