This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 09/30/2021 at 20:04:33 (UTC).

TRUIST BANK vs. ASENCIO, JUAN

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 TRUIST BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ASENCIO, JUAN. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN M KOHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEVIN M KOHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUIST BANK

Defendant

ASENCIO, JUAN

Davenport, FL 33837

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AVRUTIS THOMAS LEE

P O Box 4137

Sarasota, FL 34230

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • HearingCourt Date: 11/03/2021; Court Time: 1:30 PM; Location: BARTOW 5 B RED ELEVATOR; Motion: PRTC - PRE-TRIAL HEARING; Section: M2; Judge: KEVIN M KOHL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE-JUAN ASENCIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialDate: 09/17/2021; Amount: 310.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: SCOTT D FOELLER; Receipt Number: 8859650

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketReason: PRTC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 11/03/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Avrutis, Thomas L