This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 16:56:07 (UTC).

TROY CAPITAL, LLC vs. BRUCE LEON

Case Summary

On 01/29/2018 TROY CAPITAL, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRUCE LEON. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD P HILL II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GERALD P HILL II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TROY CAPITAL, LLC

Defendant

BRUCE, LEON

Lakeland, FL 33811-

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • DispositionParty: LEON BRUCE; Disposition Code: DFLT; Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Date: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - WITH ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT - RECEIVED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - RECEIVED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketCLERKS DEFAULT/ LEON BRUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED LEON BRUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • FinancialDate: 09/24/2018; Amount: 10.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: DAVID MICHAEL KAMINSKI; Receipt Number: 7727366

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- LEON BRUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED - LEON BRUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • FinancialDate: 02/01/2018; Amount: 410.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: DAVID MICHAEL KAMINSKI; Receipt Number: 7475277

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- LEON BRUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less