This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 15:52:56 (UTC).

TRACEY LAUREN B vs. GILBERT ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 12/14/2017 TRACEY LAUREN B filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GILBERT ANTHONY. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRACEY LAUREN B

Defendant

GILBERT ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketFINAL ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CHILD PICK UP ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketIMPROPER VENUE AND FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketRESPONDENTS VERIFIED MOTION TO DISMISS PETITIONERS MOTION FOR EMERGENCY PICK UP ORDER FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketVENUE AND FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketRESPONDENTS VERIFIED MOTION TO DISMISS PETITIONERS MOTION FOR EMERGENCY PICK UP ORDER FOR IMPROPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketLETTER FROM SELF HELP PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketReason: EMERG MOT CHILD PICK-UP ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 01/17/2018 08:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketORDER REGARDING EMERGENCY EX PARTE RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketFAMILY MEMO TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketBIRTH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketCLERK'S DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION FOR CHILD PICK-UP ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less