This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 12:51:26 (UTC).

TOP SPIRITS, LLC. vs. WILSON ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 12/05/2017 TOP SPIRITS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILSON ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN L SELPH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEVEN L SELPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOP SPIRITS, LLC., A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

REPUBLIC NATIONAL DISTRIBUTING COMPANY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE

515 East Park Avenue, 2Nd Floor

Tallahassee, FL 32301

WILSON NATHAN

Winter Haven, FL 33880

THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL REGULATION, DIVISION OF ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES AND TOBACCO

2601 Blair Stone Road

Tallahassee, FL 32399

SOUTHERN GLAZER'S WINE AND SPIRITS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF

R.A. Corporation Service Company, 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

WILSON ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

R.A. Nathan K. Wilson, 241 3Rd Street Sw

Winter Haven, FL 33880

THE STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

2450 Shumard Oak Blvd., Building 1

Tallahassee, FL 32399-

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

04/27/2018: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING (863-534-4006)

02/28/2018: NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING (863-534-4006)

DEFAULT REPUBLIC NATIONAL DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LLC

01/17/2018: DEFAULT REPUBLIC NATIONAL DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LLC

DEFAULT NATHAN WILSON

01/17/2018: DEFAULT NATHAN WILSON

DEFAULT WILSON ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LLC

01/17/2018: DEFAULT WILSON ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LLC

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT

01/08/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT

01/08/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT

01/08/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - WILSON ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LLC

12/06/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - WILSON ENTERTAINMENT GROUP LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - SOUTHERN GLAZER'S WINE AND SPIRITS, LLC

12/06/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - SOUTHERN GLAZER'S WINE AND SPIRITS, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

12/06/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL REGULATION DIVISION OF

12/06/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL REGULATION DIVISION OF

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

12/05/2017: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

EXHIBIT C

12/05/2017: EXHIBIT C

EXHIBIT B

12/05/2017: EXHIBIT B

EXHIBIT A - BALLOON PROMISSORY NOTE & SECURITY AGREEMENT/CHATTEL MORTGAGE

12/05/2017: EXHIBIT A - BALLOON PROMISSORY NOTE & SECURITY AGREEMENT/CHATTEL MORTGAGE

COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE SECURITY AGREEMENT/DIVISION OF ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES AND TOBACCO LIEN AND FOR

12/05/2017: COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE SECURITY AGREEMENT/DIVISION OF ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES AND TOBACCO LIEN AND FOR

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/05/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketUNDELIVERED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDELIVERED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketUNDELIVERED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • FinancialDate: 04/04/2018; Amount: 140.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: LAW OFFICES OF MARC R. TILLER; Receipt Number: 7544162

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL REGULATION DIVISION OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketEXHIBIT E - PERSONAL PAYMENT GUARANTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT D - BALLOON PROMISSORY NOTE & SECURITY AGREEMENT/CHATTEL MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT A - BALLOON PROMISSORY NOTE & SECURITY AGREEMENT/CHATTEL MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketFOR OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE SECURITY AGREEMENT/DIVISION OF ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES AND TOBACCO LIEN AND FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less