This case was last updated from Polk County Courts on 07/11/2020 at 12:33:41 (UTC).

TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. vs. ADVANCE TECHNOLOGICAL RADIOLOGY P.A.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ADVANCE TECHNOLOGICAL RADIOLOGY P A. This case was filed in Polk County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Polk, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CATHERINE L COMBEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0000

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Polk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Polk, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CATHERINE L COMBEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC.

C/O Armando Nozzolillo, Esq., 50 N. Laura Street, Suite 3000

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

ADVANCE TECHNOLOGICAL RADIOLOGY P.A.A FLORIDA PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION

C/O Anthony Rosa, Registered Agent, 2235 North Boulevard West

Davenport, FL 33837

MURRAY, AN INDIVIDUAL A/K/A IVAN G. MURRAY, M.D. IVAN G

Orlando, FL 32836

ROSA, AN INDIVIDUAL A/K/A JOSE ROSA, M.D. JOSE

Lakeland, FL 33803

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOZZOLILLO ARMANDO

50 North Laura St Ste 3000

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant Attorney

DELL-POWELL DENISE

450 S Orange Avenue Suite 200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN AND DAMAGES

01/09/2020: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN AND DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • DispositionParty: JOSE ROSA, AN INDIVIDUAL A/K/A JOSE ROSA, M.D.; Disposition Code: JDIS; Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Date: 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DispositionParty: IVAN G MURRAY, AN INDIVIDUAL A/K/A IVAN G. MURRAY, M.D.; Disposition Code: JDIS; Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Date: 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DispositionParty: ADVANCE TECHNOLOGICAL RADIOLOGY P.A.A FLORIDA PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION; Disposition Code: JDIS; Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Date: 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketORDER ON CONSENT TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketAGREED ORDER CANCELLING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED -ORDER ON CONSENT MOTION TO STAY AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCONSENT MOTION AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCalendar entry deleted for: 02/26/2020 04:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketReason: OTSC_REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCalendar entry added for: 02/26/2020 04:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • FinancialDate: 01/09/2020; Amount: 439.00; Description: Fees Assessed; Payer/Responsible Party: C. RENEE SMITH; Receipt Number: 8231301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ISSUE FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- JOSE ROSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- IVAN G. MURRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- ADVANCE TECHNOLOGICAL RADIOLOGY, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less